The State of Texas et al v. Penguin Group (USA) Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Referred: | Michael H Dolinger |
Case #: | 1:12-cv-03394 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2012 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 19, 2014 5:49 PM EDT |
All Plaintiffs
Class Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Kobo Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Apple Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penguin Group (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Utah
|
|
Plaintiff
The State of Louisiana
|
|
Plaintiff
The State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Michigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Nebraska
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of North Dakota
|
|
Plaintiff
The State of Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of South Dakota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Delaware
|
|
Plaintiff
The State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
the State of Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Kansas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Iowa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Idaho
|
|
Plaintiff
The State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Arkansas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Alaska
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of Alabama
|
|
Plaintiff
The District of Columbia
|
|
Plaintiff
The Commonwealth of Virginia
|
|
Plaintiff
The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 05/15/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Terminated: 05/15/2012
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |