Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-01525
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2020
Terminated:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 26, 2020 8:37 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
RONNIE HOOVER
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/07 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by RONNIE HOOVER (WATTS, MIKAL) Modified on 9/7/2022 (djb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 09/07 12:49 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: A REMINDER Re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The referenced document was posted incorrectly and will be modified by the clerk to reflect the correct title of the pleading "STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE". For future filings the correct Event Selection is "Stipulation of Dismissal" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents." (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 9:06 AM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by RONNIE HOOVER. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]