Maryland District Court
Judge:Paul W Grimm
Case #: 8:20-cv-00252
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2020
Terminated:Oct 14, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jul 26, 2020 7:40 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company
Represented By
William Alexander Goldberg
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Julie A Reddig
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd.
contact info
Joshua Schmand
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Counter Defendant
Lawrence Goodman
Represented By
David C Tobin
Tobin O Connor And Ewing
contact info
Richard Wiedis
Diaz Reus And Targ
contact info
Defendant
Harvey M. Goodman
in his capacity as Managing Member of Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC 6 Reservoir Circle Suite 202
Baltimore, MD 21208
Represented By
William Alexander Goldberg
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Julie A Reddig
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd.
contact info
Joshua Schmand
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Defendant
Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC
6 Reservoir Circle Suite 202
Baltimore, MD 21208
Represented By
William Alexander Goldberg
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Julie A Reddig
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd.
contact info
Joshua Schmand
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Defendant
The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company
Represented By
William Alexander Goldberg
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Julie A Reddig
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd.
contact info
Joshua Schmand
Lerch Early And Brewer Chtd
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence Goodman
207 Prettyman Drive
Rockville, MD 20850
Represented By
David C Tobin
Tobin O Connor And Ewing
contact info
Richard Wiedis
Diaz Reus And Targ
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Goodman Gable Gould Adjusters International, Inc.
Terminated: 03/30/2020
10110 Molecular Drive Suite 300
Rockville, MD 20850


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
41 41 order Settlement Order Wed 10/14 9:43 AM
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/14/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 10/14 7:36 AM
Settlement Conference held on 10/13/2020 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Thu 10/01 1:08 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Substitute Party. Kathy Goodman added.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/1/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
39 39 motion Substitute Party Wed 09/23 10:57 AM
MOTION to Substitute Party and Suggestion of Death by Lawrence Goodman(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 18, 2020
38 38 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Fri 09/18 12:18 PM
LETTER ORDER Rescheduling Remote Settlement Conference to Tuesday, October 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/18/2020. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 09/10 2:16 PM
Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
37 37 misc Status Report Mon 08/31 10:18 AM
STATUS REPORT filed Jointly pursuant to Court's Paperless Order dated June 30, 2020 by Lawrence Goodman(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
36 36 order Order Tue 06/30 9:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING this case for 60 days. The parties are directed to file a status report by August 31, 2020 that includes whether Plaintiff Lawrence Goodman's personal representative will continue this action. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/30/2020. (pk3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order for Settlement Conference Tue 06/30 8:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER postponing the July 16, 2020 settlement conference pending further developments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/30/2020. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
34 34 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 06/29 4:03 PM
Correspondence re: advising of death of Plaintiff (Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
33 33 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Fri 06/19 11:45 AM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Thursday, July 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/19/2020. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
32 32 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/17 5:05 PM
Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
31 31 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 05/21 12:03 PM
Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to23 Counterclaim by Lawrence Goodman.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
30 30 order Order Mon 05/18 12:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING29 Joint Status Report. The remaining motion to dismiss briefing deadlines set forth in ECF No. 19 are stayed pending mediation. If mediation is not successful, the parties will include proposed date(s) to complete the motion to dismiss briefing in their status report. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/18/2020. (pk3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Status Report Mon 05/18 10:46 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) in response to the Courts Paperless Order (ECF No. 28) by Harvey M. Goodman, Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
28 28 order Order Mon 05/11 3:47 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing today's telephone conference. I have referred this case to Magistrate Judge Sullivan for a settlement conference. The discovery deadlines contained in the Scheduling Order, ECF No. 20, are informally stayed for 90 days. The parties are directed to file a status report within 90 days, or within two weeks after the close of mediation, whichever is sooner. The parties will submit a joint status report no later than Monday, May 18, 2020 indicating whether they are requesting a stay of the remaining motion to dismiss briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/11/2020. (pk3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/11 3:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/11/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/07 11:54 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lawrence Goodman.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 04, 2020
25 25 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 05/04 4:52 PM
Correspondence re: Initial Disclosure of Damages(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
24 24 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 05/04 4:47 PM
Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Damages Disclosure (Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Counterclaim Mon 05/04 3:17 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Lawrence Goodman, filed by The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company.(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Redline of Amended Counterclaim
Monday, April 27, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/27 4:14 PM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Conference for May 11, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/27/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/27 4:12 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/27/2020.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Discovery Protocols
20 20 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/27 4:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/27/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
19 19 order Order Thu 04/23 3:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. I have reviewed the Motions to Dismiss filed by Harvey M. Goodman and Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC. ECF Nos. 12, 13. These motions were filed without following the procedures I outlined in my Letter Order regarding the filings of motions, ECF No. 3. These motions will be accepted as filed, but further disregard for the pre-motion procedure will result in motions being struck without further notice. Plaintiff Lawrence Goodman is directed to file a brief or briefs in response to these motions by May 7, 2020. Defendants may then file a brief or briefs in reply by May 21, 2020. The brief or briefs in response should be no more than 10 pages total and the brief or briefs in reply should be no more than 6 pages total. I will issue a scheduling order and discovery order related to all parties separately. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/23/2020. (pk3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/20 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A Reddig on behalf of Harvey M. Goodman, Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC, The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company Related [+]
Related: [-] ddig, Julie
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/20 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Alexander Goldberg on behalf of Harvey M. Goodman, Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC, The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company (Goldberg, William)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 18, 2020
16 16 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Sat 04/18 7:01 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC (Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Sat 04/18 6:58 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company identifying Corporate Parent Molecular Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate NFA/GGG, Inc., Other Affiliate Rollins Accounting & Inventory Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Atlantic Estimating, LLC, Other Affiliate GGG of Puerto Rico, Inc. for The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company, The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company.(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Sat 04/18 6:51 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Lawrence Goodman by The Goodman-Gable-Gould Company.(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sat 04/18 6:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sat 04/18 6:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Harvey M. Goodman(Schmand, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 30, 2020
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/30 12:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harvey M. Goodman, Goodman Gable Gould Adjusters International, Inc., Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC, filed by Lawrence Goodman.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Redline of Amended Complaint
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 2:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawrence Goodman. Harvey M. Goodman waiver sent on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 2:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawrence Goodman. Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC waiver sent on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 2:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawrence Goodman. Goodman Gable Gould Adjusters International, Inc. waiver sent on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 9:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Richard Wiedis. Attorney Richard Wiedis will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 02/03 11:44 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard N. Wiedis by Lawrence Goodman. The fee has already been paid.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Mon 02/03 8:55 AM
QC NOTICE:4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Lawrence Goodman needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 11:51 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard N. Wiedis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8481491.) by Lawrence Goodman(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/29 10:52 AM
LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/29/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 9:22 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Harvey M. Goodman, Goodman Gable Gould Adjusters International, Inc., Naylors Office Property Venture, LLC.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 7:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8479997.), filed by Lawrence Goodman.(Tobin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet