Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-01806
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00169
Last checked: Monday Jul 27, 2020 7:04 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
WILLIAM CAMPBELL
Represented By
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/10 8:55 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by WILLIAM CAMPBELL. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/10 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of WILLIAM CAMPBELL (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/06 1:33 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A were transferred to the 3M MDL on January 29, 2020. Accordingly, each plaintiff was required to file a Short Form Complaint on his or her individual docket by February 18, 2020. See Case No. 3:19md2885, Pretrial Order No. 17, ECF No. 763 at 2. On February 19, 2020, the Court sua sponte extended the deadline for these plaintiffs to file their Short Form Complaints to February 26, 2020. To date, the requisite filings have not been made. Accordingly, the Court will afford the plaintiffs one final opportunity to file a Short Form Complaint by 3/13/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 03/04 3:59 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:12 Order, (short form complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/19 12:42 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A were transferred to the 3M MDL on January 29, 2020. Accordingly, each plaintiff was required to file a Short Form Complaint on his or her individual docket by February 18, 2020. See Case No. 3:19md2885, Pretrial Order No. 17, ECF No. 763 at 2. To date, no Short Form Complaints have been filed in these cases. On consideration, the Court will afford the plaintiffs another opportunity to file a Short Form Complaint by 2/26/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/19/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 02/19 8:58 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 Order, (Short form Complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/29 11:28 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form Complaints) due by 2/18/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 01/29 10:39 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00169. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 01/29 9:42 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-53) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
6 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-169 JRT/KMM. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7395599) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/29/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet