Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:20-cv-80136
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1333 Admiralty - Services Rendered
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2020
Terminated:Apr 05, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 27, 2020 8:40 AM EDT
Custodian
Rybovich Boat Company, LLC
Represented By
Farris James Martin, III
Stroup & Martin
contact info
Defendant
Shakra Holdings Limited
Represented By
Michael T. Moore
Moore & Company
contact info
Clay Michael Naughton
Moore & Company, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Vladimir Gusinsky
Represented By
Clay Michael Naughton
Moore & Company, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
M/Y Blue Star
Represented By
Clay Michael Naughton
Moore & Company, P.A.
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Mega Yacht Refinishing LLC
Represented By
James Hubert Perry, II
Perry & Neblett, P.A.
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Yacht Chandlers, Inc.
Represented By
James Hubert Perry, II
Perry & Neblett, P.A.
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Marco Volschenk
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Maria Tuvilla
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Gregor Tuvilla
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Rodilin Thornburn
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
David Thornburn
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Dave Talling
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Southern Cross Boatworks, Inc.
Represented By
David Edward Irwin
Irwin Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Dan Rankin
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Bud Morken , III
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Karen Magpantay
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Richard Lima
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Frittzie Dumdum
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Michael Brittenden
Represented By
Adam B. Cooke
Gunther Mcintosh, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
F. David Famulari
2332 Galiano Street 2nd Floor
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Plaintiff
Rybovich Boat Company, LLC
Represented By
Farris James Martin, III
Stroup & Martin
contact info
James Weller Stroup
Stroup & Martin
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2021
OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
GPO Nov 29 2021
ORDER denying 187 Motion to Separate the Artwork as a Non-Appurtenance. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)

Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Monday, August 01, 2022
284 284 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Mon 08/01 12:42 PM
ORDER granting283 Motion for Disbursement of Funds to Intervening Crew Plaintiffs' counsel, Fowler White Burnett P.A. in the amount of $5,887.20. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]