Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-08562
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2020
Terminated:Oct 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
World Tech Toys, Inc.
28904 Avenue Paine
Valencia, CA 91355
Represented By
World Tech Toys, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kmart Holding Corporation
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Marianna Udem
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, October 04, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/04 12:06 PM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-8562 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
8 8 notice Notice, Dismissal Fri 10/01 5:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation.(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/22 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Monday, April 19, 2021
6 6 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/19 9:54 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against World Tech Toys, Inc. Related [+]. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, April 09, 2021
5 5 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/09 11:50 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Marianna Udem on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation.(Udem, Marianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/24 12:07 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 11:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Friday, February 14, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Fri 02/14 11:55 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 01/31 9:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-08562 rdd] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13715788. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Thursday, January 30, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 01/30 10:29 AM
Adversary case 20-08562 Complaint against World Tech Toys, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Marianna Udem on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. (Udem, Marianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A