Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-28953

Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Paulette J Delk
Case #: 2:20-ap-00025
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2020
Terminated:May 15, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK
PO BOX 10438 MAC F8235-02F
DES MOINES, IA 50306
Represented By
WELLS FARGO BANK
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Hisky
1014 Greenview
Collierville, TN 38017
Represented By
Preston Wilson
Wampler & Pierce, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Friday, May 15, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/15 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-25 Closed (krm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Fri 04/24 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Withdrawing Complaint To Recover Preferential Transfer AND Notice of Entry of Judgment (related document(s):1 Complaint) (krm)
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Fri 04/24 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Withdrawing Complaint To Recover Preferential Transfer AND Notice of Entry of Judgment (related document(s):1 Complaint) (krm)
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
4 4 2 pgs order Order (Adversary) Tue 04/21 11:30 AM
Order Withdrawing Complaint To Recover Preferential Transfer AND Notice of Entry of Judgment Related [+] (krm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
court Minutes Thu 03/26 1:00 PM
Minutes; Disposition: WITHDRAWN. Order to be prepared by Preston Wilson. Related [+] Order due by 04/07/2020. Auto-docketed(DocketCall)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-00025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Ashley Hisky against WELLS FARGO BANK. (Wilson, Preston)
Saturday, February 01, 2020
3 3 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sun 02/02 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (RE:Complaint). (related document(s)1 Adversary case 20-00025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Ashley Hisky against WELLS FARGO BANK. ) Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at Room 630, Memphis, TN. (dch)
Thursday, January 30, 2020
2 2 court Summons And Notice Of Pretrial Conference Thu 01/30 11:43 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at Room 630, Memphis, TN. (dch)
Related: [-] Complaint1 Adversary case 20-00025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Ashley Hisky against WELLS FARGO BANK.
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/29 7:19 PM
Adversary case 20-00025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Ashley Hisky against WELLS FARGO BANK. (Wilson, Preston)
Related: [-]