New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:20-cv-00709
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2020
Terminated:Aug 31, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 25, 2020 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Marc O'Connor
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Greg Stowell
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Michael Simone
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Adam Savino
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Ben Pallant
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Michael Mongon
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Ray McDonough
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Lucy Massafra
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Leslie Mancuso
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Mahopac Central School District
Represented By
Steven Leon Banks
Thomas, Drohan, Waxman, Petigrow & Mayle LLP
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Lawrence Keene
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
David Furfaro
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Anthony DiCarlo
Represented By
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Schneider
24 Jackson Road
Mahopac, NY 10541
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Isabella Schneider
Terminated: 01/30/2020
24 Jackson Road
Mahopac, NY 10541
Plaintiff
Jackson H. Schneider
Terminated: 01/30/2020
24 Jackson Road
Mahopac, NY 10541
Plaintiff
Karly L. Schneider
Terminated: 01/30/2020
24 Jackson Road
Mahopac, NY 10541


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
46 46 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 05/24 2:54 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to45 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Schneider. USCA Case Number 21-2201 UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/24/2022..(nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Tue 05/24 2:55 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:46 USCA Mandate,..(nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
45 45 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 09/13 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from43 Opinion & Order,44 Clerk's Judgment,,. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465407018666. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 09/13 2:46 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:45 Notice of Appeal..(nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Mon 09/13 2:47 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for45 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Schneider were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
44 44 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 08/31 12:58 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:43 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Mahopac Central School District, Adam Savino, Anthony DiCarlo, Ben Pallant, David Furfaro, Greg Stowell, Lawrence Keene, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Marc O'Connor, Michael Mongon, Michael Simone, Ray McDonough against Jonathan Schneider. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated August 31, 2021, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/31/2021) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 RIght to Appeal
43 43 15 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 08/31 11:38 AM
OPINION & ORDER re:37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint . filed by Greg Stowell, Mahopac Central School District, Adam Savino, Marc O'Connor, Lawrence Keene, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Ben Pallant, David Furfaro, Lucy Massafra, Leslie Mancuso, Anthony DiCarlo, Michael Simone. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion, (Doc. 37), and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/31/2021) (mml)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Tue 08/31 1:43 PM
Mailed a copy of44 Clerk's Judgment and Appeals forms to Jonathan Schneider at 24 Jackson Road Mahopac, NY 10541.(km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel - Limited Appearance Thu 07/08 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for Jonathan Schneider..(Bell, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
40 40 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/01 4:02 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(D'Amico, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
39 39 misc Letter Fri 01/15 2:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 1/15/2021 re: Letter in response to defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider..(rj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
38 38 misc Internet Citation Wed 12/23 9:50 AM
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:30 Order for Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. (sjo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
37 37 motion Dismiss Tue 12/15 5:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(D'Amico, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Amanda E. D'Amico,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 12, 2020
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/12 5:09 PM
ORDER granting32 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: See Doc. 35. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/12 5:05 PM
ORDER granting34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Motion due by 12/15/20. Opposition due by 1/18/21. Reply due by 2/1/21. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/12 4:56 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Amanda E. D'Amico dated November 12, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(D'Amico, Amanda)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/12 2:09 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on32 Motion for Extension of Time: Per section 1.E of my Individual Practices, Defendants shall advise as to whether Plaintiff consents. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/12 1:23 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Amanda E. D'Amico dated November 12, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(D'Amico, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/02 11:05 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending21 Amended Complaint, against Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. Related document:21 Amended Complaint,.(rj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
30 30 3 pgs order Order for Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel Thu 10/01 11:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING PRO BONO COUNSEL:..For the foregoing reasons, the Clerk of Court is directed to attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff for the limited purposes described above. The Court advises Plaintiff that there are no funds to retain counsel in civil cases and the Court relies on volunteers. Due to a scarcity of volunteer attorneys, a lengthy period of time may pass before counsel volunteers to represent Plaintiff. If an attorney volunteers, the attorney will contact Plaintiff directly. There is no guarantee, however, that a volunteer attorney will decide to take the case, and plaintiff should be prepared to proceed with the case without an attorney. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/1/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 10/01 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/30/2020. Plaintiff Jonathan Schneider appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel Amanda D'Amico, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Ryan Partelow appears telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (if choosing to file) to be submitted by October 30, 2020. Defendants' Motion (or Answer) to be submitted by November 30, 2020; Plaintiff's opposition (if Motion filed) due January 4, 2021; Defendants' reply due January 18, 2021. The Court will look into volunteer counsel availability for the purposes of mediation for Plaintiff. See transcript. (Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb) (wc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
29 29 misc Letter Wed 09/30 10:41 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 9/25/2020 re: Please accept this communication as a response to the Defendants letter dated August 28, 2020 regarding their request for a pre-motion conference and permission to move to dismiss. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider..(rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
28 28 misc Letter Mon 09/28 10:37 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 9/25/2020 re: Please accept this communication as a response to the Defendants letter dated 8/20/20 regarding their request for a pre-motion conference and permission to move to dismiss. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider.(sbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
27 27 order Order on Motion for Conference Fri 08/28 5:01 PM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion for Conference: Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/30/20 at 10:00 am. Plaintiff shall state his position, by letter of no more than 3 pages, by 9/27/20. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Conference Fri 08/28 3:41 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Amanda E. D'Amico dated August 28, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(D'Amico, Amanda)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda E. D'Amico on behalf of Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(D'Amico, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/02 9:49 PM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Defendants' time to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 8/30/20. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/02 4:02 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Lewis Silverman dated July 2, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(Silverman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
22 22 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 07/01 2:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Anthony DiCarlo served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; David Furfaro served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lawrence Keene served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Mahopac Central School District served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Leslie Mancuso served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lucy Massafra served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Ray McDonough served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Michael Mongon served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Marc O'Connor served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Ben Pallant served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Adam Savino served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Michael Simone served on 6/15/2000, answer due 7/6/2000; Greg Stowell served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was made by Cert. Mail. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sc) (sc). (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/1/2020) Cert. Mail Receipt
Att: 2 (7/1/2020) Cert. Mail Receipt
Friday, June 12, 2020
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/15 3:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending 1 Complaint, against Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. Related document: 1 Complaint.(sc)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Mon 06/15 2:58 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider, dated 6/11/20 re: Please accept this communications as a response to your directions related to our conference call on 4/28/20. As per your recommendations, I amended the complaint to clarify this action etc. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Tue 04/28 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/28/2020. Plaintiff Jonathan Schneider appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel(s) Amanda D'Amico, Esq. and Lewis Silverman, Esq. appear telephonically. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to be submitted by June 11, 2020. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (or Answer) to be submitted by July 13, 2020; Plaintiff's opposition (if Motion filed) due August 13, 2020; Defendants' reply due August 27, 2020. See transcript. (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
18 18 misc Letter Fri 04/24 10:54 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 4/21/2020 re: Please accept this communication as a response to the Defendants Letter dated March 20, 2020 regarding their request for a pre-motion conference and permission to move to dismiss the complaint. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
19 19 misc Letter Wed 04/29 12:55 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 4/21/20 re: Please accept this communication as a response to the Defendants letter dated March 20, 2020 regarding their request for a pre-motion conference and permission to move to dismiss the complaint. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider.(sbr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
17 17 order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 04/21 9:24 AM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Conference: Ms. D'Amico may attend the conference (which will be by phone) along with Mr. Silverman. (If she wishes to be able to appear alone between now and when she is admitted, she may apply for permission to appear pro hac vice). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Conference Tue 04/21 9:19 AM
LETTER MOTION for Conference Permission for Attorney to Appear at Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Lewis Silverman dated April 21, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(Silverman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
15 15 order Order on Motion for Conference Fri 03/20 5:52 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Conference: Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 12:15 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' letter by 4/21/20. This will be a phone conference; see my emergency rules on the Court's website for more information. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Conference Fri 03/20 9:18 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference re Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Lewis Silverman dated March 20, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(Silverman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
13 13 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 03/17 12:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE of Complaint and Additional Items, 19 page letter dated 12/14/19 served on Mahopac Central School on 1/29/20. Service was accepted by Denise Ryan-School Secretary. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis R. Silverman on behalf of Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(Silverman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Leon Banks on behalf of Mahopac Central School District..(Banks, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/13 11:46 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants may have until 3/20/20 to respond to the Complaint. Mr. Banks should file a notice of appearance for the District forthwith. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/13 10:57 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Steven L. Banks dated February 13, 2020. Document filed by Mahopac Central School District..(Banks, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
8 8 misc Remark Wed 02/05 4:32 PM
Original Signature Page. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sbr)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Wed 02/05 4:22 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 2/5/20 re: thank you for your time regarding this communication. It is being written in hopes to communicate my family's predicament to you regarding the above referenced case. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider.(sbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
misc Mail Order by USPS Fri 01/31 8:38 AM
Mailed a copy of5 Order,6 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, to Jonathan Schneider 24 Jackson Road Mahopac, NY 10541. (aea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
6 6 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 01/30 8:34 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff Jonathan Schneider is the only Plaintiff in this case. The Com1 dismisses without prejudice the claims of the other Plaintiffs named in the caption of the complaint. Because the civil cover sheet, complaint, and supporting documentation reveal the full name of Plaintiffs minor child, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to limit electronic access to these documents (ECF Nos. 1, 111, 2) to a "case-participant only" basis. Plaintiff must comply with Rule 5.2(a)(3) when submitting any documents in the future. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Isabella Schneider and Jackson H. Schneider terminated.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/30/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 8:30 PM
ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to resubmit the signature page of the complaint with an original signature to the Court within thirty days of the date of this order. A copy of the signature page is attached to this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed.The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 19l5(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in form a pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/30/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Thu 01/30 10:56 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jonathan M. Schneider consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/30 10:45 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 01/30 10:46 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/30 10:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 10:49 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell. (sac)
Related: [-]