Original Case: 1:19-cv-01199

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv.pr-01103
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2020
Terminated:Dec 21, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 22, 2021 3:33 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
DOMINION DENTAL SERVICES USA, INC.
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DOMINION DENTAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DOMINION DENTAL USA, INC.
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DOMINION NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DOMINION DENTAL SERVICES OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CAPITAL BLUECROSS
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CAPITAL ADVANTAGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AVALON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Katherine Lea McKnight
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
David Alan Carney
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Paul G. Karlsgodt
BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PROVIDENCE HEALTH PLAN
Represented By
Daniel Peter Reing
DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARK BRADLEY
Represented By
Barrett Jay Vahle
STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON, LLP
contact info
Bernard Joseph DiMuro
DIMUROGINSBERG, PC
contact info
Matthew D. Schultz
LEVIN PAPANTONIO THOMAS MITCHELL RAFFERTY & PROCTOR, P.A
contact info
Andrew Neil Friedman
COHEN MILSTEIN SELLERS & TOLL, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/22/2021 3:27 AM EST
Thursday, January 30, 2020
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01199-LMB-MSN. Case manager: JeffNeal. 20-1103 JSN [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:15 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01199-LMB-MSN. Mailed to: Matthew Schultz. 20-1103 JSN [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:37 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1103 with 20-1102 . Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Matthew Schultz. [1000673392] 20-1102 20-1103 JSN [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:39 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/10/2020. Response Brief due 04/09/2020. Mailed to: Matthew Schultz. 20-1102 20-1103 JSN [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:41 PM]
Related: [-]