Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-08581
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Accounting Principals, Inc.
Dept Ch 14031
Palatine, IL 60055
Represented By
Accounting Principals, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
StarWest, LLC
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Steven J. Reisman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
5 5 misc Case Reassignment Notice (NO BNC NOTICE) Wed 03/30 11:45 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Robert D. Drain to Judge Sean H. Lane. Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Acosta, Annya)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 03/30 3:43 PM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-8581 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Tavarez, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
4 4 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 03/29 8:51 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of StarWest, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Friday, February 28, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 02/28 12:16 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of StarWest, LLC.
Related: [-] 1 ,2 isman, Steven
Friday, February 14, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Fri 02/14 1:21 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Sat 02/01 2:46 PM
Adversary case 20-08581 Complaint against Accounting Principals, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of StarWest, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Att: 1 Exhibit A