Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02435
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00242
Last checked: Saturday Aug 01, 2020 5:59 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIE GONZALEZ
Represented By
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
21 21 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/10 11:44 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
20 20 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 10/02 8:23 AM
ORDER. Plaintiffs' motions to remand are DENIED. All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs are now reinstated as to Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2020. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Wed 04/15 3:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Declaration of Vince C. Reuter filed by JULIE GONZALEZ. (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
18 18 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 04/15 2:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JULIE GONZALEZ. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Remand to State Court Wed 04/15 2:47 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by JULIE GONZALEZ. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/15 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of JULIE GONZALEZ (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/15 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of JULIE GONZALEZ (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/15 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of JULIE GONZALEZ (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 1:14 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JULIE GONZALEZ. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
12 12 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/03 2:31 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Master Short Form Complaint/Amended Complaint due by 2/24/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 02/03 10:51 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00242. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-54) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
9 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE by Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-242 (JRT/KMM). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7407716) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/3/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet