Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John R Padova
Case #: 2:20-cv-00546
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 29, 2020 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC.
Represented By
DAVID A. SHARGEL
Bracewell LLP
contact info
LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Saxton Stump
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MAHONEY
Represented By
DAVID S. GLANZBERG
Glanzberg Tobia & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/29 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOHN MAHONEY As To ALL DEFENDANTS(GLANZBERG, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
15 15 misc Declaration Fri 06/26 10:46 AM
Declaration re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC.. (STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/26 10:42 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service, proposed Order.(STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
13 13 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Wed 06/03 3:26 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING 6/26/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/3/20. 6/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/29 7:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JOHN MAHONEY against FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC., filed by JOHN MAHONEY.(GLANZBERG, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/22 4:49 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT ON OR BEFORE 5/29/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/22/20. 5/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIE E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
10 10 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 05/08 1:39 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flight Centre Travel Group Limited by FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC..(STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/08 1:08 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Disclosure Statement.(STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Appendix
Monday, April 06, 2020
8 8 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Mon 04/06 11:46 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING 5/8/20.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/6/20. 4/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Tue 03/17 10:14 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC. TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CLASS ACTION IS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 4/9/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/16/20. 3/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 03/17 10:04 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID A. SHARGEL, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/16/20. 3/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (W/ECF APPLICATION) AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
5 5 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/12 4:45 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Shargel by FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14175957.).(STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
4 4 misc Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts) Tue 03/10 3:31 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC.. (STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/10 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE F. STENGEL on behalf of FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
2 2 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/25 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN MAHONEY re: Accredited Process Service, LLC served Summons and Complaint upon FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC.. FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (GLANZBERG, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 210617.), filed by JOHN MAHONEY.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER SHEETS
service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 3:54 PM
1 Summons Issued as to FLIGHT CENTRE TRAVEL GROUP (USA) INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 2/3/2020 (sg, )
Related: [-]