Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. v. Societe Generale, S.A.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Referred: | Jennifer E Willis |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00851 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996 |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 1:19-cv-22842 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2020 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Societe Generale S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Bank of Nova Scotia
|
|
Defendant
The National Bank of Canada
|
|
Plaintiff
Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
151 | 151
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 07/07 12:05 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:150 Letter filed by Societe Generale S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Stephen M. Cohen terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/7/2023) (tg) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
150 | 150
misc
Letter
Thu 07/06 5:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Stephen M. Cohen dated July 6, 2023 re: Withdrawal of attorney Stephen M. Cohen from the case. Document filed by Societe Generale S.A...(Cohen, Stephen) |