New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:20-cv-00942
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2020
Terminated:Jun 29, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2020 5:46 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Judith Tallett
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Dawn Vaughn
Counter Defendant
Collins Asset Group, LLC
Represented By
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jonathan M. Robbin
J. Robbin Law
contact info
Gregory P. Cronin
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gerald Holmes
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Marie Johnson
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Karen Lawrence
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Richard Lester
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hanh Nguyen
Defendant
Donna Peters
Defendant
Karen Warren
Defendant
Jeffrey Arnold
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Katherine Arnold
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Browne
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 4240 Sunrise Ridge Rd.
Shingle Springs, CA 95682
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Burks
105 Riverway Drive
Youngsville, LA 70592
Defendant
Tom Chrisman
Defendant
Gertrude Collins
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Neal Collins
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Traci Cougle
Defendant
Diane Denton
Defendant
Thomas Denton
Defendant
Ernesto DiGiordano
Defendant
Diversified Financing, LLC
Defendant
John Does(s)
Defendant
Francis Early
Represented By
Russell D. King
King Yaklin, & Wilkins, LLP
contact info
Collin Hatcher
King, Yaklin & Wilkins, LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Ernest
Defendant
David Evans
Defendant
Debbie Evans
Defendant
Evans Family Trust
Defendant
Scott Farwick
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Ferguson
Defendant
Ferrum II, LLC
Represented By
John W. Shanklin, II
Mccleskey, Harriger, Brazill & Graf, L.L.P.
contact info
Dayton Peter Haigney, III
Dayton P. Haigney
contact info
Defendant
Firenze Family Trust
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
William Fraser
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jay Sham Gabehart
Defendant
Sherrie George
Defendant
Jeanine Gorchen-Krasley
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeanine Hilliard Gorechan
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Winston Harris
18250 Grand Cypress Creek Court
Baton Rouge, LA 70810
Defendant
Fei Havenor
Defendant
Scott Havenor
Defendant
Jacqueline Hazey
Defendant
Lian He
Defendant
Daniel Hebert
Defendant
Sharal Herbert
Defendant
Amy Huang
Defendant
IRA Services Trust Company
Defendant
John C Jenkins
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Yanbo Jiang
Defendant
Cathy Kaiser
Defendant
James Karg
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Leonard Kleinpeter
Defendant
James Lappas
Defendant
Venetia Lappas
Defendant
Trish Laveck
Defendant
Ang Li
Defendant
Hongbin Li
Defendant
Jin Li
Defendant
Harold Likey
Defendant
Frank Lopinto
Defendant
Arthur Marks
Represented By
Michael Anthony Starvaggi
Starvaggi Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Peggy McCauley
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John McCormick
Represented By
Lavinia Andreea Acaru
Zelenitz, Shapiro & D'Agostino, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mitch McDonald
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 2453 Shirt Tail Trail
Cool, CA 95614
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Terry McKnight
Defendant
Keith Morales
Defendant
Jeff Mullis
Defendant
Pirro Peti
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Susan Pollinger
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Provident Trust Group
Represented By
Michael James Slocum
Greenberg Traurig Llp (new Jersey)
contact info
Defendant
Jill Ann Purkey
18250 Grand Cypress Creek Court
Baton Rouge, LA 70810
Defendant
Wendy Pyne
Represented By
Stephen Justin Jones, I
Jones, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Micaela Rogers
6431 Mil Mar Blvd
Alexandria, LA 71302
Defendant
Terri Saltzman
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 209 E. Kansas Street
Glen Elder, KS 67446
Defendant
Luis San Miguel
Represented By
Leonard Alan Benowich
Benowich Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Olivia San Miguel
Represented By
Leonard Alan Benowich
Benowich Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Frank Schenck
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Brady Sessums
6913 Chandler Dr.
Baton Rouge, LA 70808
Defendant
Yiling Shi
Defendant
Jackline Slezak
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 53160 Avenida Madero
La Quinta, CA 92253
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sonoqui, LLC
Defendant
Carlise Stargill
Defendant
Judith Tallett
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 1008 Villa Serena Circle
Rocklin, CA 95765
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Thaxton
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Thaxton
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Gregory Tindall
Represented By
Melinda Jane Steuer
Law Offices Of Melinda Jane Steuer
contact info
Defendant
Orvis Tully
Defendant
Brad Van
Defendant
Vantage Retirement Plans, LLC
Defendant
Dawn Vaughn
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 4211 East Enrose Circle
Mesa, AZ 85205
Defendant
Peina Wang
Defendant
Deldeirdra Webb
5023 Mobile Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70817
Defendant
Blake Wellerman
Defendant
Lory Williams
Represented By
Melinda Jane Steuer
Law Offices Of Melinda Jane Steuer
contact info
Defendant
Brian Wilson
Defendant
Hong Yu
Defendant
Xio Yun Pan
Defendant
Yu Zhang
Defendant
Bill Zoellin
Defendant
Bob McCauley
Represented By
Jason R Doss
The Doss Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Nola
12435 Parvilla Ave.
Baton Rouge, LA 70816
Plaintiff
Collins Asset Group, LLC
Represented By
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jonathan M. Robbin
J. Robbin Law
contact info
Gregory P. Cronin
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Randall Bahjat
Terminated: 02/28/2020
Defendant
David Farwick
Terminated: 02/28/2020
Defendant
Dan Nolan
Terminated: 02/04/2020
Defendant
Mark Poulsen
Terminated: 02/28/2020


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
291 291 misc Transcript Wed 04/20 4:29 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRO held on 3/11/2020 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Arends-Dieck, (914) 390-4103. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/11/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2022..(Arends-Dieck, Christina)
Related: [-]
290 290 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Wed 04/20 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRO proceeding held on 3/11/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Arends-Dieck, Christina)
Related: [-]