Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:William Keith Watkins
Referred: Stephen Michael Doyle
Case #: 2:20-cv-00076
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2020
Terminated:Jul 16, 2020

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 08, 2022
18 18 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 04/08 4:54 PM
Partial filing fee received: $32.00, receipt number 4602066478. (bes, )
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 04/08 4:53 PM
Partial filing fee received: $19.00, receipt number 4602066481. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
16 16 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 02/10 1:59 PM
Partial filing fee received: $20.56, receipt number 4602065941. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
15 15 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 12/21 1:07 PM
Partial filing fee received: $20.41, receipt number 4602065513. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
14 14 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 10/08 12:03 PM
Partial filing fee received: $13.60, receipt number 4602064890 (bes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
13 13 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 12/04 4:38 PM
Partial filing fee received: $ 4.00, receipt number 4602060409. (bes, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 12/04 4:37 PM
Partial filing fee received: $ 12.00, receipt number 4602060420. (bes, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 12/04 4:34 PM
Partial filing fee received: $ 31.40, receipt number 4602060417. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
10 10 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 09/09 4:13 PM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 6.00, receipt number 4602059316. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
9 9 order Judgment Thu 07/16 10:49 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the prior proceedings and orders of the court, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this action is DISMISSED prior to service of process. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/16/2020.(kh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist
8 8 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 07/16 10:37 AM
ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED and that this action is dismissed prior to service of process in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/16/2020. (kh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/09 12:54 PM
No objections filed to the4 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
7 7 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/30 9:49 AM
Partial filing fee received: $ 10.00, receipt number 4602058388. (amf, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/30 9:48 AM
Partial filing fee received: $ 14.00, receipt number 4602058386. (amf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/23 2:45 PM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 4.40, receipt number 4602058301. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 06/16 12:18 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed prior to service of process in accordance with the directives set forth in 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii); Objections to R&R due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/16/2020. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
3 3 3 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Thu 02/06 11:57 AM
ORDER ON MOTION granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/6/2020. (furn: cashier) (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit Wed 02/05 2:54 PM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steven Sarandon Barnes. (es, ) Modified on 2/5/2020 to correct the file date to reflect as 2/3/2020 (qc/es,wcl )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Inmate 1983 Complaint Wed 02/05 2:40 PM
Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against James Glenn Goggans, filed by Steven Sarandon Barnes.(es, ) Modified on 2/5/2020 to correct the file date to reflect as 2/3/2020 (qc/es,wcl )
Related: [-]