New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sandra J Feuerstein
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:20-cv-00627
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2020
Terminated:Jun 29, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2020 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
All Island Cleaning Corp.
Represented By
Jennifer Patricia Nigro
Twomey Latham Shea Kelley Dubin & Quartararo LLP
contact info
Jeffrey W. Pagano
Twomey Latham Shea Kelley Dubin & Quartararo LLP
contact info
Aylan Chadwick Briedis
Twomey Latham Shea Kelley Dubin & Quartararo LLC
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Cubells
Represented By
Jennifer Patricia Nigro
Twomey Latham Shea Kelley Dubin & Quartararo LLP
contact info
Jeffrey W. Pagano
Twomey Latham Shea Kelley Dubin & Quartararo LLP
contact info
Aylan Chadwick Briedis
Twomey Latham Shea Kelley Dubin & Quartararo LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Bossa
Represented By
Peter Arcadio Romero
contact info
Plaintiff
Neftali Bossa
Represented By
Peter Arcadio Romero
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Castro
Represented By
Peter Arcadio Romero
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 29, 2020
order Order on Motion for Settlement Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/29 10:33 AM
ORDER finding as moot15 Motion for Settlement; granting16 Motion for Settlement; ORDER DISMISSING CASE: : In accordance with Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), the Court has scrutinized the parties' Settlement Agreement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. The Court's determination includes findings that the fee allocated to Plaintiff's counsel is likewise fair and reasonable. Therefore, the parties' Settlement Agreement is approved and this case is dismissed with prejudice. However, notwithstanding the language in Paragraphs 2 and 9 of the Settlement Agreement, the Court declines to retain jurisdiction over this matter for the sole purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement (should such enforcement ultimately be necessary). See Brandner Corp. v. V-Formation, Inc. , 98 F. App'x 35, 37 (2d Cir. 2004) ("As a general rule, a federal district court does not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement...."); Bryant v. Emigrant Mortg. Co., Inc. , No. 10-cv-0102, 2011 WL 3876978, at *6 (E.D.N.Y. Aug. 31, 2011) (stating that disputes over federal settlements, even those that resolve federal claims, are "quintessentially... of contractual interpretation and performance and wholly governed by state law"). Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/29/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 28, 2020
16 16 motion Settlement Sun 06/28 7:56 PM
Amended MOTION for Settlement Corrected Motion for Approval of Settlement by Jorge Bossa, Neftali Bossa, Rafael Castro. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Fully Executed Settlement Agreement
15 15 motion Settlement Sun 06/28 6:26 PM
MOTION for Settlement by Jorge Bossa, Neftali Bossa, Rafael Castro. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Fully Executed Settlement Agreement
Friday, March 13, 2020
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/13 3:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Nigro, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 03/02 8:41 AM
ORDER granting DE11 Motion for Protective Order. The parties' Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order, DE [11-1], is approved and SO ORDERED; see attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/2/2020. (Kantor, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/28 1:19 PM
FLSA MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: Mediation shall be completed no later than June 29, 2020; the initial conference scheduled for March 17, 2020 is adjourned to July 22, 2020. SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. So Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/28/2020. (Cubano, Jazmin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
11 11 motion Protective Order Thu 02/27 4:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Island Cleaning Corp., Stephen Cubells. (Nigro, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Pagano on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pagano, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aylan Chadwick Briedis on behalf of All Island Cleaning Corp., Stephen Cubells (aty to be noticed) (Briedis, Aylan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/18 8:07 AM
Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties' joint motion is granted to the extent that the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 3/16/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/18/2020. (Kantor, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2020
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/17 7:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Summons Returned Executed,4 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,5 Summons Returned Executed by All Island Cleaning Corp., Stephen Cubells. (Nigro, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/17 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Patricia Nigro on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Nigro, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/14 9:38 AM
ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 6/8/2020 is advanced to 3/17/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order upon defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/14/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/13 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Bossa, Rafael Castro, Neftali Bossa. All Island Cleaning Corp. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/07 1:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Bossa, Rafael Castro, Neftali Bossa. Stephen Cubells served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/05 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 4:34 PM
Summons Issued as to All Island Cleaning Corp., Stephen Cubells. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 02/04 4:31 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 02/04 4:26 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12339583, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Jorge Bossa, Rafael Castro, Neftali Bossa. (Romero, Peter) Modified on 2/4/2020 (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/04 4:30 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 8:25 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 2/4/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]