California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:20-cv-00800
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2020
Terminated:Jan 26, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Aug 01, 2020 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Steve Anderson
Defendant
Balance Staffing
Defendant
Daniel Garcia
Defendant
MVP Personnel Staffing Group
Defendant
Sandy Malloy
Defendant
Joseph Mendiola
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
Defendant
Vince Woodard
Plaintiff
George Jarvis Austin
Esq. (TBA) George J. Austin, esq. (TBA). 240 Channel Street 431
Stockton, CA 95202

GPO Feb 05 2020
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why 3 application to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied. Response due by February 26, 2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 5, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
136 136 appeal USCA Order Wed 11/16 11:27 AM
United States Supreme Court's Notice regarding Application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari (Application No. 22A400) re96 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by George Jarvis Austin (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]