Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-05074

Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:20-ap-00013
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc.
507 Shaw Ct
Severn, MD 21144
Represented By
Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
William J Hoffman, II
507 Shaw Ct
Severn, MD 21144
Represented By
William J Hoffman, II
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy William Lighthiser
151 Brierwood Blvd.
Hanover, PA 17331
Represented By
Steven M. Carr
Ream Carr Markey Woloshin & Hunter LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
33 33 court Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF) Tue 03/30 9:12 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:20-ap-13 Closed. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 14, 2021
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice Dismissing Case) Mon 03/15 1:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice Dismissing Case) Related [+]. Notice Date 03/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31
Friday, March 12, 2021
31 31 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Bankruptcy Case Dismissed) Fri 03/12 10:31 AM
Notice that the related Bankruptcy Case has been dismissed. Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding after 3/26/2021. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
30 30 court Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event) Tue 01/26 1:39 PM
Proceeding Memo re: Status Conference on Complaint; held. Stipulation to be filed within thirty (30) days . Appearances: Haley Rohrbaugh. Non-Appearances: Steven Carr. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. Stipulation due 2/25/2021. (Goodling, Joan)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
29 29 court Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event) Tue 12/22 1:40 PM
Proceeding Memo re: Status Conference on Complaint; canceled and rescheduled at request of party to be heard in conjunction with Adversary 1:20-ap-00021. Appearances: N/A. Non-Appearances: N/A. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 1/26/2021 at 09:30 AM at The hearing will be held telephonically - Harrisburg case. (Goodling, Joan)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 11/26 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
Monday, November 23, 2020
27 27 order Status Conference Mon 11/23 11:13 AM
Amended Order setting status conference Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 12/15/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Courthouse/Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Bankruptcy Ctrm, 3rd floor, Harrisburg, PA 17101. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 1 ,25
Saturday, November 21, 2020
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 11/22 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/21/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25
Thursday, November 19, 2020
25 25 order Hearing (Ex. Hearing, Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference) Thu 11/19 11:18 AM
Order setting Status Conference. Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 12/15/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Courthouse/Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Bankruptcy Ctrm, 3rd floor, Harrisburg, PA 17101. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
24 24 misc Report of Mediator Tue 11/10 9:20 AM
Report of Mediator Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Mott & Gendron Law on behalf of Kara Gendron Related [+]. (Gendron, Kara)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, August 21, 2020
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/22 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/21/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 08/19 10:17 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Initial Mediation Conference. Related [+]. Clerks Office Follow-Up Due by 11/2/2020. (George, Deborah)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
21 21 motion Extend Time Tue 08/18 8:43 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Initial Mediation Conference. Filed by Kara Katherine Gendron of Mott & Gendron Law on behalf of Kara Gendron Related [+]. (Gendron, Kara)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, August 06, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/07 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
19 19 order Appointing Mediator Tue 08/04 1:35 PM
Order Appointing Mediator Kara Gendron rep by , Kara Katherine Gendron and assigning case to mediation Related [+]. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 15
18 18 court Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event) Tue 08/04 10:27 AM
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding; held. Record Made. Court to enter order today appointing mediator. Appearances: Lawrence Young by CourtCall. Non-Appearances: Steven Carr. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Goodling, Joan)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, June 01, 2020
17 17 order Continue/Reschedule a Hearing or Trial Mon 06/01 11:44 AM
Order Continuing hearing originally set for June 2, 2020 at 9:30 AM. IT IS SO ORDERED on 6/1/2020. /s/Henry W. Van Eck (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM at Harrisburg case - The hearing will be held telephonically. (Goodling, Joan)
Related: [-] 7 , 13
16 16 misc Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3) Mon 06/01 9:03 AM
Request to continue hearing with concurrence Filed by Elizabeth Haley Rohrbaugh of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc. Related [+]. (Rohrbaugh, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 ,7 , 13
15 15 misc Request for Mediation (L.B.F. 9019-2) Mon 06/01 8:45 AM
Request for Mediation pursuant to L.B.R. 9019-2(b) Filed by Elizabeth Haley Rohrbaugh of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc. Related [+]. (Rohrbaugh, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 ,7
Friday, May 29, 2020
14 14 misc Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance Fri 05/29 10:22 AM
Notice is given that counsel intends to appear telephonically at the hearing. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Elizabeth Haley Rohrbaugh of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc. Related [+]. (Rohrbaugh, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 7 , 13
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
13 13 court Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event) Tue 04/28 1:28 PM
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding; called and continued . Appearances: Haley Rohrbaugh by CourtCall. Non-Appearances: Steven Carr. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/2/2020 at 09:30 AM at Harrisburg case - The hearing will be held telephonically. (Goodling, Joan)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 24, 2020
12 12 misc Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance Fri 04/24 9:10 AM
Notice is given that counsel intends to appear telephonically at the hearing. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Elizabeth Haley Rohrbaugh of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc. Related [+]. (Rohrbaugh, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 7 , 11
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
11 11 court Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event) Tue 03/24 3:22 PM
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding; called and continued . Appearances: Haley Rohrbaugh participated by CourtCall. Non-Appearances: Steven Carr. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/28/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Courthouse/Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Bankruptcy Ctrm, 3rd floor, Harrisburg, PA 17101. (Goodling, Joan)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
10 10 misc Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance Wed 03/18 10:05 AM
Notice is given that counsel intends to appear telephonically at the hearing. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Elizabeth Haley Rohrbaugh of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc. Related [+]. (Rohrbaugh, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
Thursday, March 12, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing) Fri 03/13 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing) Related [+]. Notice Date 03/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
8 8 court Hearing Tue 03/10 8:15 AM
Notice setting hearing on the Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Courthouse/Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Bankruptcy Ctrm, 3rd floor, Harrisburg, PA 17101. (George, Deborah)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 06, 2020
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/06 1:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Elizabeth Haley Rohrbaugh of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc. Related [+]. (Rohrbaugh, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing) Mon 02/10 2:48 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Steven M. Carr of Ream Carr Markey Woloshin & Hunter LLP on behalf of Timothy William Lighthiser Related [+]. (Carr, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
5 5 court Summons (original, amended, reissued, third-party) Wed 02/05 12:47 PM
Summons setting answer dates, issued for plaintiff to serve Related [+]. Answers to Complaint/Summons are due on: 3/6/2020. Answers to Complaint/Summons by the United States or an office or agency thereof are due on: 3/11/2020. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 court Summons (original, amended, reissued, third-party) Wed 02/05 12:34 PM
Summons setting answer dates, issued for plaintiff to serve Related [+]. Answers to Complaint/Summons are due on: 3/6/2020. Answers to Complaint/Summons by the United States or an office or agency thereof are due on: 3/11/2020. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 notice Discrepancy between CM/ECF entry and uploaded PDF Wed 02/05 12:31 PM
Notice to Filing Party (S. Carr): Discrepancy between CM/ECF entry and uploaded PDF. The name of one of the Defendants was updated to match what is listed on the image of the Complaint. Related [+]. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Filing fee not required Wed 02/05 12:22 PM
Filing fee not required. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Davis, Karen)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 9:28 AM
Adversary case 1:20-ap-00013. Complaint Filed by Steven M. Carr on behalf of Timothy William Lighthiser against Arundel Diesel & Performance, Inc., William J Hoffman. Filing Fee due in the amount of $ 350.00. Certificate of Service of the Complaint and Summons is due by: 05/5/2020. 12 Related [+] (Carr, Steven)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Proposed Order