Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02615
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2020
Terminated:Feb 19, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 03, 2020 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
RUSTY SANDERS
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 19, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/19 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RUSTY SANDERS (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by RUSTY SANDERS. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]