Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02643
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2020
Terminated:May 04, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 03, 2020 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JAMES ACUFF
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
2 2 16 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/06 2:45 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by JAMES ACUFF. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]