Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 4:14-bk-40715
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2014
Creditor Meeting:May 13, 2014
Terminated:Oct 19, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Oct 02, 2014

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
S.E. Shires, Inc.
4A Spaceway Ln
Hopedale, MA 01747-1534
Represented By
Christine E. Devine
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Lougee LLP
contact info
Paul W. Carey
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie &
contact info
Gina Barbieri O'Neil
Mirick O'Connell
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608
Represented By
Lisa D. Tingue
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Richard T. King
United States Trustee
contact info
Creditor Committee Chair
Thomas Sharp
1730 Forest Avenue
Wilmette, IL 60091
Represented By
Donald Ethan Jeffery
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info
Christopher M. Condon
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info
Michael K. O'Neil
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


1. The High Cost of Saving a Failing Business (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 03/26/2015
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, October 19, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only) Fri 10/19 12:11 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (jk)
Related: [-]