Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-08896
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2020
Terminated:Jul 31, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Naumann/Hobbs Material Handling Corporation II, Inc.
4335 E Wood St.
Phoenix, AZ 85040
Represented By
Naumann/Hobbs Material Handling Corporation II, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
StarWest, LLC
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Steven J. Reisman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, July 31, 2020
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/31 12:13 PM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-8896 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
4 4 notice Notice, Dismissal Thu 07/16 5:05 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of StarWest, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Friday, February 28, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 02/28 11:07 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of StarWest, LLC.
Related: [-] 2 ,1 isman, Steven
Thursday, February 13, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Thu 02/13 10:37 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 02/06 12:35 AM
Adversary case 20-08896 Complaint against Naumann/Hobbs Material Handling Corporation II, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of StarWest, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Att: 1 Exhibit A