Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02706
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00285
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 05, 2020 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER MARKEY
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Saturday, March 07, 2020
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 03/07 12:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Master Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHRISTOPHER MARKEY. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/06 1:37 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A were transferred to the 3M MDL on February 7, 2020. Accordingly, each plaintiff was required to file a Short Form Complaint on his or her individual docket by February 27, 2020. See Case No. 3:19md2885, Pretrial Order No. 17, ECF No. 763 at 2. To date, no Short Form Complaints have been filed in these cases. On consideration, the Court will afford the plaintiffs another opportunity to file a Short Form Complaint by 3/13/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 03/05 3:25 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 Order, (short form complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/07 4:14 PM
ORDER - Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Master Short Form Complaint (Amended Complaint) due by 2/27/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 02/07 4:05 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re: Counsel of Record MATTHEW JAMES BARBER, Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben,80 S. 8th Street,Ste 5120,Minneapolis, MN 55402. (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 02/07 3:36 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00285. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 8:43 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-55) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-285 JRT/KMM. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7416898) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/7/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet