Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00012
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Feb 08, 2020 1:22 AM CST
Defendant
Coray Quan Brown (3)
Represented By
Thomas John Burbank
Thomas J. Burbank, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Prentis Leewood Delaney (2)
Represented By
Larry DeWayne Eastepp
Larry D Eastepp PC
contact info
Defendant
Jamarius Earl Jones (4)
Represented By
John Dale McElroy
Federal Defender'S Office - Beaumont
contact info
Defendant
David Nathan Taylor (1)
Represented By
Dustin Ryan Galmor
Galmor Stovall & Gilthorpe PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Russell Elmer James, III
U S Attorney'S Office - Beaumont
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/08/2020 4:07 AM CST
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to David Nathan Taylor (1), Prentis Leewood Delaney (2), Coray Quan Brown (3), Jamarius Earl Jones (4). (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to David Nathan Taylor (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
5 5 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Prentis Leewood Delaney (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
7 7 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Coray Quan Brown (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
9 9 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Jamarius Earl Jones (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
NOTICE OF HEARING as to David Nathan Taylor, Prentis Leewood Delaney, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones Initial Appearance set for 1/15/2020 02:00 PM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of David Nathan Taylor, Prentis Leewood Delaney, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn:Initial Appearance as to David Nathan Taylor, Prentis Leewood Delaney, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones held on 1/15/2020. Defts sworn and advised of their rights and pending allegations. Deft requested court appointed counsel; financial affidavits executed. Deft remanded to USM custody. Appearances: Russell James, AUSA; Mark Goforth, USPO. (Court Time: 2:30pm - 2:40pm)(Courtroom Deputy & FTR Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for Detention by USA as to David Nathan Taylor. (James, Russell) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Prentis Leewood Delaney. (James, Russell) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Coray Quan Brown. (James, Russell) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jamarius Earl Jones. (James, Russell) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Nathan Taylor (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
15 15 Order Appointing Counsel as to David Nathan Taylor: Appointment of Attorney Dustin Galmor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to David Nathan Taylor Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2020 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
17 17 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Prentis Leewood Delaney (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
18 18 Order Appointing Counsel as to Prentis Leewood Delaney: Appointment of Attorney Larry Eastepp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Prentis Leewood Delaney Detention Hearing set for 1/22/2020 02:30 PM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
20 20 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Coray Quan Brown (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
21 21 Order Appointing Counsel as to Coray Quan Brown: Appointment of Attorney Thomas Burbank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Coray Quan Brown Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2020 01:30 PM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
23 23 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jamarius Earl Jones (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jamarius Earl Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Jamarius Earl Jones Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2020 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/15/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jamarius Earl Jones Preliminary / Detention Hearng set for 1/17/2020 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to David Nathan Taylor Preliminary / Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2020 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Coray Quan Brown Preliminary / Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2020 01:30 PM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn at defense counsel's request. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Coray Quan Brown Detention Hearing / Preliminary Hearing reset for 1/17/2020 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Prentis Leewood Delaney Preliminary / Detention Hearing set for 1/22/2020 02:30 PM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn at defense counsel's request. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn:Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to David Nathan Taylor, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones held on 1/17/2020. Defts appeared w/cnsl and waived the preliminary hearings and consented to detention at this time. Defts remanded to USM custody. Appearances: Russell James, AUSA; Dustin Galmor, Tom Burbank, and John McElroy, def cnls; Mark Goforth, USPO. (Court Time: 11:03am - 11:07am) (Courtroom Deputy & FTR Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
26 26 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by David Nathan Taylor (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
27 27 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Coray Quan Brown (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
28 28 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jamarius Earl Jones (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
29 29 ORDER OF DETENTION as to David Nathan Taylor, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/17/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn:Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing as to Prentis Leewood Delaney held on 1/22/2020. Deft appeared w/cnsl and waived the preliminary hearing and consented to detention at this time. Deft remanded to USM custody. Appearances: J Ross, AUSA; L Eastepp, Def cnsl; M Goforth, USPO. (Court Time: 2:34pm - 2:37pm) (Courtroom Deputy & FTR Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
30 30 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Prentis Leewood Delaney executed in open court. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Prentis Leewood Delaney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/22/2020. (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to David Nathan Taylor, Prentis Leewood Delaney, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones: Detention hearings all waived (ttp, ) [1:20-mj-00003-ZJH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
Set/Reset Hearings as to David Nathan Taylor, Prentis Leewood Delaney, Coray Quan Brown, Jamarius Earl Jones: Arraignment on indictment set for 2/18/2020 02:00 PM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
33 33 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to David Nathan Taylor (1) count(s) 1, 2, Prentis Leewood Delaney (2) count(s) 1, 2, Coray Quan Brown (3) count(s) 1, Jamarius Earl Jones (4) count(s) 1, 2. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
34 34 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to David Nathan Taylor (bjc, )
Related: [-]
35 35 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Prentis Leewood Delaney (bjc, )
Related: [-]
36 36 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Coray Quan Brown (bjc, )
Related: [-]
37 37 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Jamarius Earl Jones (bjc, )
Related: [-]