Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:20-bk-10290
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2020
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jun 08, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Valeritas Holdings, Inc.
750 US Highway 202 Ste 600
Bridgewater, NJ 08807-2597
Represented By
Maris J. Kandestin
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
624 624 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Tue 02/20 6:42 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 01/04/2024 Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors Corp.. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]
623 623 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Tue 02/20 6:39 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2023 Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors Corp.. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]