Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45057 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Western, 5:19-cv-00926 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 09, 2020 11:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/03/2020 3:41 PM EST |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3012277. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-4562 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Okla County NoR (Service Packet), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 02 State-Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 59 pgs Exhibit 03 Petition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 04 Summons Returned - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 05 Summons Returned - PD-RX Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 06 Summons Returned - Watson Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 07 Summons Returned - Purdue Pharma LP, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 08 Summons Returned - Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 09 Summons Returned - Watson Laboratories Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Summons Returned - Actavis Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 Summons Returned - Mallinckrodt LLC, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 Summons Returned - Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 Summons Returned - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 Summons Returned - Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 Summons Returned - Actavis PLC, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 Summons Returned - Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 Summons Returned - The Purdue Frederick Company, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 Summons Returned - Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 Summons Returned - Cephalon Inc, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 Summons Returned - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 Summons Returned - Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 Summons Returned - Purdue Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 Summons Returned - Par Pharmaceutical Inc, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 Summons Returned - Endo Health Solutions Inc, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 Summons Returned - Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 Summons Returned - Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 Summons Returned - Specgx LLX, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 Summons Returned - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Endo et al), | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Endo et al), | ||
Att: 31 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
3 | 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
4 | 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County.(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Trotter Remand Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Adams Remand Order | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand Motion by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County.(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty v. Purdue, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty v. Purdue, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Remand Order_Town of Randolph v. Purdue, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Opinion_Dinwiddle v. Purdue, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Opinion_IL Public Risk v. Purdue | ||
7 | 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Bragalone on behalf of Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
8 | 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
9 | 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
11 | 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand Motion filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
12 | 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions by Plaintiff Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County and by Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
13 | 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
14 | 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
16 | 16 14 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
17 | 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Par Pharmaceutical Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's and Defendant PD-Rx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Joint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/12/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER granting14 the Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/13/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,21 Response to Motion by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
23 | 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
25 | 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,21 Response to Motion filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
26 | 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
27 | 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC (Epstein, Jon) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
28 | 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC . (Epstein, Jon) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
29 | 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,21 Response to Motion filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. (Epstein, Jon) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
31 | 31 TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ank) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
32 | 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00926. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |