Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02717
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00300
Last checked: Saturday Aug 08, 2020 6:10 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
JUSTIN TABERT
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, March 05, 2020
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/05 3:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Master Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JUSTIN TABERT. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Docket Annotation Thu 03/05 8:17 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - The referenced document was posted incorrectly and has been corrected by the clerk. Please be advised that the correct Event Selection for the MDL transferred in cases is "Amended Complaint" then free text "Master Short Form Complaint." Please also note that the short form complaint form being used has AEARO defendants spelt incorrectly . For any questions please call 850-470-8188. Re11 Amended Complaint, filed by JUSTIN TABERT (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
11 11 cmp Complaint Wed 03/04 4:59 PM
Master Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by JUSTIN TABERT. (Originally filed as a Complaint in error. Refiled as amended complaint by Clerk) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 03/03 7:38 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:10 Order, (Amended Complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/10 2:26 PM
ORDER - Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Master Short Form Complaint (Amended Complaint) due by 3/2/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 02/10 10:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00300. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
8 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-55) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-300 (JRT/KMM). (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7420595) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet