New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:20-cv-01148
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2sx Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2020
Terminated:Oct 30, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Aug 08, 2020 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc.
Represented By
Gerard Douglas O'Shea
Cooley LLP
contact info
Dong Phuong Van Nguyen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Steven Andrew Zuckerman
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Lockinger
Cooley LLP
contact info
Elior Daniel Shiloh
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (water St)
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane Lewis
Represented By
Daniel Bright
Lichten & Bright, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, October 30, 2020
55 55 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/02 10:22 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, Plaintiff Diane Lewis and Defendant Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc. (collectively, the "Parties"), that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and pursuant to a settlement agreement that shall be judicially enforceable, all of the claims that were asserted or could have been asserted in the above-captioned action are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any Party as against each other. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action with prejudice under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
54 54 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 10/30 3:10 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc...(Shiloh, Elior)
Related: [-]