City of Henderson v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45062 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 3:19-cv-00067 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 09, 2020 12:52 PM EDT |
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cabinet for Health and Family Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DepoMed Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KVK Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kentucky Pharmacy Board
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Henderson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Smith Drug Company, Inc.
Terminated: 12/16/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Commonwealth of Kentucky
Terminated: 01/27/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/03/2020 3:47 PM EST |
Sunday, September 29, 2019 | ||
MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel by Henderson, City of(JJ) Modified filer & text on 9/30/2019 (JJ). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
MOTION to Continue Litigation against Defendants with Pending Bankruptcy by Henderson, City of(JJ) Modified filer & text on 9/30/2019 (JJ). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Beverly Sackler, from Franklin Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-941. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4476583),(JJ) (JJ). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 25 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint 1-25, | ||
Att: 3 25 pgs Exhibit Complaint 26-50, | ||
Att: 4 25 pgs Exhibit Complaint 51-75, | ||
Att: 5 25 pgs Exhibit Complaint 76-100, | ||
Att: 6 25 pgs Exhibit Complaint 101-125, | ||
Att: 7 25 pgs Exhibit Complaint 126-150, | ||
Att: 8 25 pgs Exhibit Complaint 151-175, | ||
Att: 9 14 pgs Exhibit Complaint 176-190 | ||
Att: 10 (9/30/2019) Exhibit B-Motion to Appoint, | ||
Att: 11 (9/30/2019) Exhibit C-Motion to Continue | ||
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
Conflict Check run. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Henderson, City of, MOTION to Continue by Henderson, City of; Error: Clerk filed motion as to an incorrect party. Clerk has corrected filing information & docket sheet to reflect the correct filer. No further action required. cc: COR (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Clerk's Note: JPML notified re1 Notice of Removal. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
3 | 3 ORDER: 1. Effective immediately, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. (CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 STIPULATION to EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME to RESPOND to the COMPLAINT by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) Modified event on 10/3/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judeg Van Tatenhove for review: re4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending Responsive Pleading Time (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Proposed Summons by Henderson, City of re5 Amended Complaint(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/8/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Commonwealth, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Matthew Bevin, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Ky Pharmacy Board, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - CHFS | ||
7 | 7 Summons Issued as to Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Kentucky Pharmacy Board; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Donald L. Miller, II.8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by KVK Tech, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
11 | 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
12 | 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid Corporation. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Mauldin on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (KJR). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
14 | 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified on 10/10/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc.(Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to David T. Arlington re25 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Scott D. Powers re26 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kevin M. Sadler re27 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re27 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.,26 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.,25 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lucas Harrison.15 MOTION to Dismiss has been filed by Smith Drug Company, Inc without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
18 | 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
19 | 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
20 | 20 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
21 | 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
22 | 22 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
24 | 24 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
25 | 25 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt | ||
26 | 26 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt | ||
27 | 27 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt | ||
28 | 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Sadler, Scott D. Powers and David Arlington on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
29 | 29 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Depomed, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Polczynski on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Polczynski, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
31 | 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fultz, Benjamin) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
32 | 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dickens, Scott) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
33 | 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hancock, Daniel) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
34 | 34 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Other Affiliate Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Fultz, Benjamin) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
35 | 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
36 | 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walgreen Co.. (Tremper, Frank) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
37 | 37 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co... (Tremper, Frank) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
38 | 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Louis Sparks on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
39 | 39 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
40 | 40 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson. (Polczynski, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
41 | 41 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Polczynski, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
42 | 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
43 | 43 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to John A. McCauley re45 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to James K. O'Connor re46 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re46 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and,45 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
44 | 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kroger Company. (Hughes, Charles) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
45 | 45 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492007)(McCauley, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
46 | 46 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492108)(O'Connor, James) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
47 | 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
48 | 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Richardson, Melissa) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
49 | 49 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Stopher.35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by CVS Health Corporation LLC, and, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
50 | 50 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Charles Hughes.44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Kroger Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
51 | 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
52 | 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kirk Ogrosky on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Ogrosky, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
53 | 53 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc... (Ogrosky, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
54 | 54 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Health Corporation LLC.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
55 | 55 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
56 | 56 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Gene L. Humphreys.51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
57 | 57 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC.. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
58 | 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc.(Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re MT for Ext of Time to File Answer | ||
59 | 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
60 | 60 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. Amended Complaint(Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
61 | 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Bevin. (Kuhn, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
62 | 62 ORDER: 1)25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. is GRANTED. 2) David T. Arlington is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, David T. Arlington w ECF Registration form [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
63 | 63 ORDER: 1)26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. is GRANTED. 2) Scott D. Powers is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, Scott D. Powers w ECF Registration form [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
64 | 64 ORDER: 1)27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. is GRANTED. 2) Kevin M. Sadler is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, Kevin M. Sadler w ECF Registration form [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
65 | 65 ORDER: 1)45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories Inc. is GRANTED. 2) John A. McCauley is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, John A. McCauley w ECF Registration form [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
66 | 66 ORDER: 1)46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories Inc. is GRANTED. 2) James K. O'Connor is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, James K. O'Connor w ECF Registration Form [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
67 | 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and MOTION for Stay of Discovery by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Fultz, Benjamin) Added MOTION to Stay on 10/18/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
68 | 68 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER ENJOINING THE CONTINUATION OF THIS PROCEEDING AS TO THE INDIVIDUAL FORMER DIRECTORS by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified on 10/18/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Amended Preliminary Injunction Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Excerpted copy of Exhibits to the Complaint for Injunctive | ||
69 | 69 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint(Purcell, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
70 | 70 Corrected MOTION to Extend Time to Answer by KVK Tech, Inc.(Miller, Donald) Modified on 10/23/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
71 | 71 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Looper, Jr on behalf of Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
72 | 72 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
73 | 73 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
74 | 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
75 | 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re70 MOTION to Amend/Correct by KVK Tech, Inc. Opposition to Corrected Motion for Extension of Time filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
76 | 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
77 | 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re69 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
79 | 79 MOTION for Julia Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Letter | ||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Julia Kavanagh re79 MOTION for Julia Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re79 MOTION for Julia Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
78 | 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cabinet for Health and Family Services. (Kleinert, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
80 | 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services(Kuhn, Matthew) Modified on 10/25/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
81 | 81 Supplemental Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation.(Michener, Carolyn) Modified on 10/25/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Record | ||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
82 | 82 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Fazal A. Shere on behalf of Kroger Company (Shere, Fazal) Modified on 10/25/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
83 | 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
84 | 84 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
85 | 85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of(Grabhorn, Andrew) (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Home Rule Cities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 5 (11/27/2019) CORRECTED Exhibit B - West-Ward Service of Process | ||
86 | 86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of85 Motion to Remand by Henderson, City of(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/29/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
87 | 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
88 | 88 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc. ; Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc... (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
89 | 89 RESPONSE to Motion re80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
90 | 90 NOTICE of 41(a) Dismissal as to Smith Drug Company, Inc. by Henderson, City of (Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
91 | 91 NOTICE of Mootness of Motions by Henderson, City of re15 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. ,60 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Smith Drug Company, Inc.(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:90 Notice of 41(a) Dismissal as to Smith Drug Company, Inc.,91 Notice of Mootness of Motions (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:50 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures - No Response filed (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
92 | 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
93 | 93 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
94 | 94 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4515142)(Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice | ||
95 | 95 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Johnstone on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
96 | 96 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commonwealth of Kentucky(Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Tendered order Extending Time to Answer | ||
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Conor Brendan O'Croinin re94 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re94 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
97 | 97 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Mauldin, Timothy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
98 | 98 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler(Mauldin, Timothy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Second Amended Order | ||
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re96 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commonwealth of Kentucky (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Joseph A. Wright for H.D. Smith, LLC, added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
99 | 99 RESPONSE to Motion re96 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
100 | 100 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kennedy Simpson on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
101 | 101 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice94 is GRANTED; and 2. Conor Brendan OCroinin is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/12/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, O'Croinin w/ ECF Registration Form [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
102 | 102 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
103 | 103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint(Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
104 | 104 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice79 is GRANTED; and 2. Julia Kavanagh is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/18/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Julia Kavanagh with ECF Reg. Form via US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
105 | 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of85 Motion to Remand by Henderson, City of filed by McKesson Corporation.(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
106 | 106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order in Takoma Regional Hospital Case, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Order in Belcher Case, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Order in Lac Courte Case, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Order in Robinson Rancheria Case, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Order in Seminole County Case, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Order in Alameda County Case, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Order in Portland Case, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Order in Alexandria Case, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Order in Galax Case, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Order in San Mateo Case, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Order in Melrose Case, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Order in Jacksonville Case, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Order in Delaware County Case, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Order in Pawnee County Case, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Order in Osage County Case, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Order in Noble County Case, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Order in Jim Wells Case, | ||
Att: 19 Proposed Order | ||
107 | 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of filed by McKesson Corporation.(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Kentucky Complaints Redline, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of S. Ahmad, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Interest of US, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - J. Polster Withdrawal of Order, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
108 | 108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky(Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum is Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order tendered Order Granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
109 | 109 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky(Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order tendered Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing | ||
110 | 110 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: (Filed in wrong case) PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 11/20/2019. Modified on 11/20/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD:110 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky was filed in the wrong case; Attorney has filed the "Corrected Motion to Expedite" in 3:19-cv-68 R. 111. *MRS* cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
111 | 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
112 | 112 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James E. Looper, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
113 | 113 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY E. Frederick Straub, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
114 | 114 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andrew J. O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
115 | 115 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Brien T. O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
116 | 116 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.(White, Jordan) Modified on 11/22/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
117 | 117 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
118 | 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
119 | 119 RESPONSE to Motion re106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
120 | 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of85 Motion to Remand by Henderson, City of filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
121 | 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anda, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
122 | 122 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anda, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Anda, Inc... (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
123 | 123 RESPONSE to Motion re109 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
124 | 124 RESPONSE to Motion re108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
125 | 125 RESPONSE to Motion re108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky Corrected filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Henderson, City of; MOTION to Continue Litigation by Henderson, City of;14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond;15 MOTION to Dismiss;58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer;60 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ;67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery;69 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint ;70 Corrected Motion to Extend Time to Answer;80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint;86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of85 Motion to Remand. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Clerk's Note: Notice to Attorney James E. Looper, Jr.112 was sent in error and counsel may disregard this notice. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
126 | 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re116 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - West-Ward US Headquarters, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Acceptance & Signature, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
127 | 127 NOTICE by Henderson, City of re85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of Corrected Exhibit(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit B - West-Ward Service of Process | ||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
128 | 128 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Kentucky of Non-Consent to Removal (Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
129 | 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky.(Johnstone, C.) Modified link on 12/5/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - MDL Order Re State Court Coordination, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order proposed Order Denying Motion to Stay | ||
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
130 | 130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew Bevin(Pitt, M.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
131 | 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation.(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Angelina Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Withdrawal of Order | ||
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew Bevin (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
132 | 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessalyn H. Zeigler on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
133 | 133 MOTION for Andrew O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4541826)(Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
134 | 134 MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4541833)(Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
135 | 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re116 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. filed by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - E-mail Communications | ||
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew J. O'Connor re133 MOTION for Andrew O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Brien T. O'Connor re134 MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re116 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.;133 MOTION for Andrew O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice and134 MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
136 | 136 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Scott M. Ahmad by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
137 | 137 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Christopher B. Essig by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
138 | 138 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sarah B. Miller by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Admission Check | ||
139 | 139 ORDER: 1. The Defendants Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice133 is GRANTED; and 2. Andrew OConnor is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/11/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Andrew O'Connor w/ an ECF Reg. Form via US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
140 | 140 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice134 is GRANTED; and2. Brien OConnor is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in theabove styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/11/2019. (CBD)cc: COR Modified cc on 12/11/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
141 | 141 MOTION for Christopher B. Essig to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4543728)(White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
142 | 142 MOTION for Scott M. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4544016)(White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Christopher B. Essig, Scott M. Ahmad re141 MOTION for Christopher B. Essig to Appear Pro Hac Vice and142 MOTION for Scott M. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re141 MOTION for Christopher B. Essig to Appear Pro Hac Vice and142 MOTION for Scott M. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
143 | 143 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel - Sarah B Miller by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC (Zeigler, Jessalyn) Modified on 12/16/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Sarah B. Miller terminated. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Party Smith Drug Company, Inc. terminated. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
144 | 144 ORDER: 1)142 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. 2) Scott M. Ahmad is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/16/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, ECF Registration form to Scott M. Ahmad [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
145 | 145 ORDER: 1)141 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. 2) Christopher B. Essig is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/16/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, ECF Registration form to Christopher B. Essig [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
146 | 146 ORDER: 1) All claims in this matter against Dft Smith Drug Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE w each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. 2) Dft Smith Drug Company Inc's pending15 Motion to Dismiss and60 Motion to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/16/2019. (SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky ,109 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on108 by Commonwealth of Kentucky (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
Clerk's Note: Counsel for terminated party Smith Drug Company requested no further service from Clerk this date. Counsel will be terminated from the action this date. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
147 | 147 ORDER:the Motion to Withdraw130 is GRANTED. The moving attorneys are relieved of further responsibility in this action.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/20/2019. (CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review re113 Notice to Attorney E. Frederick Straub, Jr - no response filed (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cabinet for Health and Family Services (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
148 | 148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cabinet for Health and Family Services(Kleinert, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
149 | 149 15 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant Commonwealth of Kentuckys Motions to Dismiss [R. 108, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00067-GFVT; R. 110, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00068-GFVT] are GRANTED; 2. All claims in these matters against Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to further filing in federal court, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees; 3. Defendant McKesson Corporations Motions to Stay Proceedings [R. 106, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00067-GFVT; R. 106, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00068-GFVT] are GRANTED; and 4. Subsequent to Defendant Commonwealth of Kentuckys dismissal, all proceedings in these cases, including the filing of responsive pleadings or motions, are STAYED pending the final decision of the JPML of whether to transfer the cases to the Northern District of Ohio for consolidation with other related cases. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/27/2020.(CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
150 | 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andy Beshear in place of Matthew Bevin. (Farris, Marc) Modified on 1/29/2020 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review per FRCP 25(d):150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for Andy Beshear in place of Matthew Bevin. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Steven Travis Mayo for Andy Beshear in place of Matthew Bevin, added. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | ||
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
151 | 151 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
152 | 152 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to Transfer Order filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/10/2020.] | |
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
153 | 153 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 3:19-cv-00067. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |