Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02763
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Re-opened:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 06, 2020
Case in other court:California Southern, 3:19-cv-02277
Last checked: Sunday Aug 09, 2020 6:09 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
SIERRA ELIZABETH
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CLAYTON L ZAMUDIO
9821 N AFOLKEY RD
DAKOTA, IL 61018

GPO Jan 24 2020
ORDER (1) Deferring Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and (2) Granting Ex Parte Application to Stay Case (Doc. 10). The Court orders this case stayed pending a final determination from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the issue of transfer. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/24/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]

Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, October 09, 2020
31 31 6 pgs order Order Fri 10/09 1:36 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's 28 MOTION to Remand is DENIED. All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs are now reinstated as to Plaintiff Clayton Zamudio. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/9/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
30 30 service Certificate of Service Wed 06/17 1:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M COMPANY re29 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, to Remand (BROCK, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 06/17 8:00 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:29 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 06/02 11:52 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:28 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
28 28 motion Remand to State Court Tue 06/02 10:31 AM
MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by CLAYTON L ZAMUDIO. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 05/28 8:46 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:27 Order Reopening Case (motion not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
27 27 2 pgs order Order Order Reopening Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/23 1:41 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's 24 MOTION to Reopen Case and Request for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to REOPEN this case and return it to the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is further directed to update the docket to reflect Zamudios current address of record. Zamudio is granted leave to file a renewed motion to remand by 5/25/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 04/23 7:23 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:26 Response to Motion,24 MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
26 26 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/22 5:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court filed by 3M COMPANY. (NOMELLINI, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/22 4:27 PM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against 3M COMPANY, filed by CLAYTON L ZAMUDIO. (djb)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Reopen Case Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/22 4:25 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case and REQUEST for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court by CLAYTON L ZAMUDIO. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 04/22 4:28 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:25 Master Short Form Complaint,24 MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
23 23 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/06 12:55 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff Clayton L. Zamudio's case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to close this case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/6/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 03/30 7:27 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 Order, (Short form complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/18 3:53 PM
ORDER - Mr. Zamudio was required to file a Short Form Complaint by March 2, 2020. See Case No. 3:19md2885, Pretrial Order No. 17, ECF No. 763. To date, no Short Form Complaint has been filed. On consideration, the Court will afford Mr. Zamudio another opportunity to file a Short Form Complaint by 3/27/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/17/2020. (form mailed w/order) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 03/10 8:04 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:21 Order, (Short Form Complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
21 21 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/11 3:35 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Short Form Complaint (Amended Complaint) due by 3/2/2020 .) (mailed complaint form with order to plaintiff) (djb)
Related: [-]
20 20 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 02/11 2:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02277. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
19 19 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Florida*.*Winston E. Arnow Federal Building, 100 N. Palafox St.**Pensacola, FL 32502* (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/28/2020) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Lifting Stay of CTO-44
Friday, January 24, 2020
18 18 ORDER (1) Deferring Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and (2) Granting Ex Parte Application to Stay Case (Doc.10 ). The Court orders this case stayed pending a final determination from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the issue of transfer. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/24/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
17 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re10 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Clayton L. Zamudio.(jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, January 16, 2020
16 16 NOTICE of Filing of Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default 11 by 3M Company Inc. re15 Request for Entry of Clerk Default(Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
15 15 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against 3M Company Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, January 13, 2020
14 14 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re:12 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Elizabeth, Sierra) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
13 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court [Public Version] filed by 3M Company Inc..(Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Opposition,
Att: 2 Table of Contents of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit 12,
Att: 4 Exhibit 13
12 12 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Elizabeth, Sierra) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
11 11 OBJECTION by 3M Company Inc. to Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default(Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
10 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by 3M Company Inc..(Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application,
Att: 5 Table of Contents of Exhibits,
Att: 6 Exhibit A,
Att: 7 Exhibit B
Thursday, January 02, 2020
9 9 NOTICE of MDL Filing: MDL 2885 Order Reinstating Stay of Conditional Transfer Order(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MDL 2885 - Plaintiff's Notice of Opposition to CTO-44
8 8 MOTION to Remand by Clayton L. Zamudio.(jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Declaration of Clayton L. Zamudio,
Att: 6 Proof of Service
Friday, December 27, 2019
7 7 Transfer Letter Received from Northern District of Florida. Case number in other court is 3:19-cv-05069 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
6 6 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Florida*.*100 N. Palafox St.**Pensacola, FL 32502-4839* (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MDL No. 2885, CTO-44
Monday, December 02, 2019
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sierra Elizabeth on behalf of 3M Company Inc. (Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by 3M Company Inc. .(Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by 3M Company Inc. . (Elizabeth, Sierra). Modified on 12/3/2019 - No corporate parent (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company Inc.. (Elizabeth, Sierra) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-02019 00045803-SC-SC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13212088.), filed by 3M Company Inc.. The new case number is 3:19-cv-02277-W-BGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/11/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 3 Proof of Service