United States of America v. Hughes
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Mendez |
Referred: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00321 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 09, 2020 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Owen Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 05/05 12:33 PM
CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). See26 Stipulation to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (York, M) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/05 11:40 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by United States of America. (Tennyson, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 04/07 10:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that this action has SETTLED. See ECF No.24 . Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file dispositional documents within thirty (30) days in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160. Additionally, any hearing dates and deadlines previously set in this matter are VACATED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 04/07 9:50 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by United States of America. Dispositional Docs due by 5/7/2021. (Tennyson, Steven) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/10 1:54 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Tennyson on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Tennyson, Steven added. (Tennyson, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Pro Hac Vice Order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/01 12:31 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/30/2020. Added attorney Allison Ford Fisher, PHV for Owen Hughes. (Tupolo, A) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/30 2:32 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bradley A. Benbrook on behalf of Owen Hughes. (Benbrook, Bradley) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Mon 11/30 2:00 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Owen Hughes for attorney Allison F. Fisher to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Benbrook, Bradley A. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9271751)(Benbrook, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Record Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 11/12 9:45 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/10/2020 MODIFYING Pre-Trial Scheduling Order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/19/2021; Discovery cutoff completed by 4/30/2021; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/8/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 11/10 4:50 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for modification of the pretrial scheduling order by Owen Hughes. (Portanova, William John) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 11/10 4:40 PM
[DISREGARD - see18 Stipulation and Proposed Order] STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for modification of the pretrial scheduling order by Owen Hughes. (Portanova, William John) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 11/10 10:13 AM
[DISREGARD - see17 Stipulation and Proposed Order] STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for modification of the pretrial scheduling order by Owen Hughes. Attorney Portanova, William John added. (Portanova, William John) Modified on 11/10/2020 |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Mon 11/09 3:00 PM
DISREGARD - attorney to re-file upon appearance] PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Owen Hughes for attorney Allison F. Fisher to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225.00, receipt number 0972-9232862) (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 11/9/2020 (Michel, G.) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Record Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/03 9:42 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Owen Hughes.(Portanova, William Flynn) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 05/29 11:32 AM
STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/29/20 ORDERING that Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/20/2020. Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/9/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Thu 05/28 10:40 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Muoio, Rachel) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/15 9:02 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/14/2020 DENYING6 Motion to Dismiss and ORDERING that Defendant shall file his answer to the complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. (Huang, H) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement
Wed 04/29 1:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for May 5, 2020 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Tue 04/21 4:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file an updated joint status report within 30 days of the Courts ruling on the pending motion to dismiss6 . (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/21 2:48 PM
OPPOSITION by United States of America to6 Motion to Dismiss. (Muoio, Rachel) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/20 5:12 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Muoio, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Thu 03/12 7:22 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Owen Hughes. Attorney Portanova, William John added. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Portanova, William) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/05 10:48 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rachel Justine Muoio on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Muoio, Rachel Justine added. (Muoio, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/20 2:58 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Owen Hughes served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Kennedy, Colleen) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for JAM
Tue 02/11 5:07 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Tue 02/11 5:07 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Owen Hughes* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Colleen M. Kennedy* *United State of America* *501 I Street, Room 10-100* *Sacramento, California 95814*. |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/11 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages against Owen Hughes by United States of America.(Kennedy, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |