Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-02844
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Aug 09, 2020 7:48 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JUSTIN CRIDDLE
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/04 4:39 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT -Short Form- against All Defendants, filed by JUSTIN CRIDDLE. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]