SAVANNAH v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-03076 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 10, 2020 4:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER granting 7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney VIRGINIA E ANELLO for CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. Attorney HENRY G GARRARD, III terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/18/2022. (djb) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting 8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney VIRGINIA E ANELLO for CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. Attorney SARA SPEAS SCHRAMM terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/18/2022. (djb) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting 9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney VIRGINIA E ANELLO for CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. Attorney ARAM V DESTEIAN terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/18/2022. (djb) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 03/14 1:38 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney ,8 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney ,9 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney (djb) |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY G GARRARD, III on behalf of CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH (GARRARD, HENRY) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by SARA SPEAS SCHRAMM on behalf of CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH (SCHRAMM, SARA) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Master Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. (DESTEIAN, ARAM) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A, which were filed by plaintiffs previously severed from multi- plaintiff actions, are deficient. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the duplicative, second-filed cases listed in the third column on Exhibit A. In the future, all pleadings and papers for these plaintiffs must be filed on the docket for the first-filed cases only (i.e., the cases listed in the second column on Exhibit A). The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the docket for all of the cases listed on Exhibit A. The plaintiffs in the cases listed on Exhibit A are directed to file amended short form complaints on the individual docket for their first filed case by 2/21/2020 . The amended complaints must comply with Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, by referencing the original multi-plaintiff complaint from which the plaintiff was severed, its civil action number, and its original filing date. This information must be added to the amended complaint immediately under the civil action number for the newly filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/14/2020. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 02/12 3:36 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER - The complaint is incorrect. see: 3:19md2885, ECF 761 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16. Multi-Plaintiff Actions. Any complaint filed by a severed plaintiff must reference the original multi-plaintiff complaint, its civil action number, and its original filing date. This information must be added to the complaint immediately under the civil action number for the newly filed individual case. Please file an amended complaint. (djb) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH. (DESTEIAN, ARAM) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 02/12 4:03 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. (djb) |