Original Case: 3:19-cv-01863

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-00507
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2020
Terminated:Dec 23, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2020 3:38 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
Sheila A. Huddleston, Judge
Represented By
Clare E. Kindall
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
George Levine, Judge
Represented By
Clare E. Kindall
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
New Britain Judicial District
Represented By
Clare E. Kindall
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Christopher Whelply, Director
Defendant - Appellee
Patricia Harrison, Admission Advisor
Defendant - Appellee
Renee Sobliki, CHRO Investigator, CHRO
Represented By
Emily V. Melendez
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Anita Zakrezewski, CHRO Investigator, CHRO
Represented By
Emily V. Melendez
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sandy M. Moore, Attorney
Defendant - Appellee
Erica Rodriguez, Attorney
Defendant - Appellee
Premier Education Group LP
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charlton Barnes, Sr.
Represented By
Charlton Barnes Sr.
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/29/2020 3:30 AM EST
Monday, February 10, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Charlton Barnes, Sr., FILED. [2775186] [20-507] [Entered: 02/11/2020 12:13 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED
2 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 01/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2775200] [20-507] [Entered: 02/11/2020 12:17 PM]
Related: [-]