Rhodes et al v. Rhodes Technologies, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45076 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Middle, 3:19-cv-00885 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2020 1:57 PM EDT |
Defendant
David Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Roger Rhodes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Silvers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lea Anne Spradlen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/16/2020 1:55 PM EDT |
Saturday, October 05, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 159 pgs COMPLAINT against AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KVK-Tech, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3007012), filed by Lea Anne Spradlen, Roger Rhodes, Anthony Silvers.(dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon Ball and Thomas C. Jessee. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gordon Ball and Thomas C. Jessee: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at[LINK:http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application] (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/29/2019. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
4 | 4 Summons issued as to AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KVK-Tech, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 Summons issued as to Allergan Finance LLC and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Vlahos, Chris) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed (Corrected) by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Vlahos, Chris) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER denying as moot7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/19. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
10 | 10 ORDER: CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer8 is GRANTED for extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/19. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jessalyn H. Zeigler and Sarah Byer Miller. MA State Bar status verified as active for Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/29/2019. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | ||
12 | 12 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the1 Complaint11 GRANTED for extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/8/19. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of Noramco, Inc. by Roger Rhodes, Anthony Silvers, Lea Anne Spradlen. (Jessee, Thomas) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Noramco, Inc. to Answer1 Complaint. Extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/14/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. O'Connor; Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3040548) by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC.(Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment - Declaration of Andrew J. O'Connor, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Declaration of Brien T. O'Connor, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment - Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER granting15 Motion for Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/2/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (Davies, Kirk) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
17 | 17 ORDER: This case is pending transfer to an MDL in the Northern District of Ohio, and the deadline for the filing of responsive pleadings has been extended pending a decision on the transfer. It is therefore ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for December 9, 2019 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, by later order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/2/2019. (am) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Warnock on behalf of Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
19 | 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Burkhalter on behalf of Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC (Burkhalter, Stuart) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock and Stuart A. Burkhalter. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | ||
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 MOTION for attorney Wendy Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3046091) by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Burkhalter, Stuart) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
PA State Bar status verified as active for Wendy Feinstein. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | ||
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
21 | 21 FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL No. 2804, transferring the case to the Northern District of Ohio. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (bs) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
22 | 22 CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER received from the ND of Ohio. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; proposed order submitted to chambers.) (bs) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
23 | 23 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2804, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/11/2020. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
24 | 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00885. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |