Bertucci et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45077 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:20-cv-00397 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2020 2:24 PM EDT |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Bertucci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Bernard Parish Coroner's Office
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/16/2020 2:21 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 152 pgs COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8129452) filed by St. Bernard Parish Coroner's Office, Bryan Bertucci.Attorney Ralph R. Alexis, III added to party Bryan Bertucci(pty:pla), Attorney Ralph R. Alexis, III added to party St. Bernard Parish Coroner's Office(pty:pla).(Alexis, Ralph) (SERVICE BY WAIVER) Modified on 2/5/2020 (ko). [Transferred from laed on 2/14/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment - Counsel for Plaintiffs, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment - List of Defendants | ||
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 2/14/2020.] | |
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (sbs) [Transferred from laed on 2/14/2020.] | |
4 | 4 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 2/14/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-00397. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |