Connecticut District Court
Judge:Janet Bond Arterton
Case #: 3:20-cv-00228
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2020
Terminated:Jan 22, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2020 9:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Kaitlin Kontyko
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Craig Jordan
Represented By
Michael J. LeMoult
Biller, Sachs, Raio & Zito
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, January 22, 2021
29 29 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/22 10:47 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal28 is Approved and So Ordered. The Clerk is requested to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/22/21.(Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Sun 01/24 5:28 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/21 12:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
27 27 order Order Fri 12/04 2:52 PM
ORDER re26 Stipulation filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is Approved and So Ordered. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/4/20.(Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
26 26 misc Stipulation Wed 12/02 3:12 PM
STIPULATION by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
25 25 respm Response Mon 10/19 2:21 PM
RESPONSE re24 Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Craig Jordan. (LeMoult, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/28 9:13 AM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/08 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/16/2021 04:00 PM. Discovery due by 3/1/2021 Following a pre-filing conference, Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2021 Status Report due by 2/9/2021 Trial Ready Date 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/7/20.(Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/29 1:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Craig Jordan.(LeMoult, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
21 21 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 06/16 9:51 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LeMoult, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
20 20 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 06/02 3:15 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kaitlin Kontyko terminated. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/2/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/29 2:51 PM
MOTION for Kaitlin A. Kontyko to Withdraw as Attorney by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 04/21 2:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/27 11:29 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time, on consent, to 4/25/20. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/27/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 03/27 11:29 AM
Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
16 16 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/26 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 25, 2020 to File a Responsive Pleading1 Notice of Removal, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/26 1:06 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, on consent. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/26/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 02/26 1:07 PM
Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/25 3:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/25 3:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 26, 2020 to File a Responsive Pleading1 Notice of Removal, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
12 12 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 02/19 10:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL : Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of10 Electronic Filing Order,9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,11 Protective Order,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,8 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,4 Jury Demand filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,5 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,6 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,7 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,3 Notice of Appearance filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
11 11 order Protective Order Wed 02/19 10:25 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 02/19 10:24 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 02/19 10:24 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/18/2020 Discovery due by 8/19/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2020 Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/18 4:20 PM
NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Certificate of Filing and Notice of Removal) (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/18 4:17 PM
NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Notice to Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b)) (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/18 4:14 PM
NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance With Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/18 4:11 PM
NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Jury Demand Tue 02/18 4:08 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kontyko on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/18 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from Superior Court J.D. of Litchfield at Torrington, case number LLI-CV20-6024667-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5701869, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Newbury, Philip)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 02/19 9:48 AM
Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]