Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-03589
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00305
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2020 5:53 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CLIFFORD CRAWFORD
Represented By
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/19 4:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by CLIFFORD CRAWFORD. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of CLIFFORD CRAWFORD (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/18 4:12 PM
ORDER - Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Short Form Complaint/Amended Complaint due by 3/9/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 02/18 2:35 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00305. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 12:31 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-56) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-305 JRT/KMM. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7422419) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet