PINEDA-MENDIOLA v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-03603 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00368 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2020 8:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSE PINEDA-MENDIOLA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JOSE PINEDA-MENDIOLA. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of JOSE PINEDA-MENDIOLA (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER - Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Short Form Complaint/Amended Complaint due by 3/9/2020 .) (djb) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00368. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-56) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-368 (JRT/KMM). (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/18/2020.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |