Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:J Nicholas Ranjan
Case #: 2:20-cv-00237
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 12, 2020 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By
Perry A. Napolitano
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Justin J. Kontul
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCO CONTRACTORS, INC.
100 Commonwealth Drive
Warrendale, PA 15086
Represented By
Christopher A. Cafardi
Cafardi Ferguson Wyrick Weis + Gabriel LLC
contact info
William J. Wyrick
Cafardi Ferguson Wyrick Weis Gabriel LLC
contact info
Meghan M. Matscherz
Cafardi Ferguson Wyrick Weis Gabriel
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
KENNETH J. BENSON
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Represented By
Kenneth J. Benson
Justus Adr Services
contact info

GPO Nov 24 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/24/2021.
GPO Dec 15 2022
ORDER denying 111 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. The parties shall complete fact discovery before presenting any renewed motions for summary judgment. The parties are FURTHER ORDERED to confer with the Special Master as to resolving any discovery disputes and finalizing a proposed schedule for the completion of fact discovery. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/15/2022. (pak)
GPO Dec 09 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER adopting and modifying 179 Special Master's Report & Recommendation. The Court hereby awards reasonable fees and costs of $238,259.20 and interest of $12,699.22 (calculated at 5.33% for one year) for a total of $250,958.42. Marco's counsel must release all cash held in escrow to Citizens within three days of this Order. The remainder of all funds shall be paid by Marco to Citizens in cash on or before 12/31/2024. In the event of nonpayment, Citizens is authorized to take action to collect any outstanding amounts by proceeding against the bond issuer of the $100,000 bond held in escrow beginning 1/1/2025. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/9/2024. (pak)

Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
212 212 respm Reply Brief Fri 05/09 4:32 PM
REPLY BRIEF re201 Motion to Compel filed by MARCO CONTRACTORS, INC.. (Cafardi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
211 211 respm Reply Brief Fri 05/09 11:16 AM
REPLY BRIEF re203 Errata in Support of Renewed Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.. (Napolitano, Perry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
210 210 order Order Wed 05/07 11:27 AM
ORDER. Special Master Invoice number 4423436 dated 5/6/2025 is hereby approved by the Court. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/7/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]