Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10361

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:20-bk-10379
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2020
Terminated:Jun 21, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Palm A.C. MSO, LLC
8700 W Flagler St Ste 280
Miami, FL 33174-2648
Represented By
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Monday, June 21, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 06/21 11:25 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
8 8 order Final Decree Thu 06/17 5:21 PM
Order Granting Final Decree Closing the Fully Administered Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 6/17/2021 (Mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Fri 05/29 5:09 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. / Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Palm A.C. MSO, LLC Filed by Palm A.C. MSO, LLC. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 04/01 5:32 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Palm A.C. MSO, LLC Filed by Palm A.C. MSO, LLC. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 04/01 5:31 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Palm A.C. MSO, LLC Filed by Palm A.C. MSO, LLC. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
4 4 10 pgs order Order Fri 02/21 4:11 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases and (II) Waiving Certain Requirements of Bankruptcy Rule 2002(n). An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Hygea Holdings Corp., Case No. 20-10361 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-10361 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 2/21/2020 (CB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 02/20 1:21 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-10379 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9653443, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Wed 02/19 4:44 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by All Care Management Services, Inc., First Harbour Health Management, LLC, First Harbour Medical Centers, LLC, Florida Group Healthcare LLC, Gemini Healthcare Fund, LLC, Hygea Acquisition Longwood, LLC, Hygea Acquisition Orlando, LLC, Hygea Health Holdings, Inc., Hygea Holdings Corp., Hygea IGP of Central Florida, Inc., Hygea IGP, LLC, Hygea Medical Centers of Florida, LLC, Hygea Medical Partners, LLC, Hygea Primum Acquisition, Inc., Hygea of Delaware, LLC, Hygea of Georgia, LLC, Hygea of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Medlife Activity Center, LLC, Mobile Clinic Services, LLC, Palm A.C. MSO, LLC, Palm Allcare MSO, Inc., Palm Allcare Medicaid MSO, Inc., Palm MSO System, Inc., Palm Medical Group, Inc., Palm Medical MSO LLC, Palm Medical Network, LLC, Palm PGA MSO, Inc., Physician Management Associates East Coast, LLC, Physician Management Associates SE, LLC, Physicians Group Alliance, LLC, Primum Alternatives, Inc., Primum Healthcare, LLC, Professional Health Choice, Inc.. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 02/19 2:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Palm A.C. MSO, LLC. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 02/19 7:43 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (LB)
Related: [-]