New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:20-ap-01104
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Clark Fredericks
914 West End Avenue
Newton, NJ 07860
Represented By
Clark Fredericks
contact info
Plaintiff
Boy Scouts of America
1325 W. Walnut Hill Lane
Irving, TX 75038
Represented By
Geoffrey F. Sasso
White And Williams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
20 20 answer Response Wed 10/25 10:46 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by Raymond M. Patella on behalf of Clark Fredericks. (Patella, Raymond)
Related: [-] 19 Document re: Notice of Occurrence of Plan Effective Date, Discharge and Injunctions filed by Robert Devine on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. filed by Defendant Boy Scouts of America, Additional Defendant Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
19 19 misc Document Wed 10/18 3:37 PM
Document re: Notice of Occurrence of Plan Effective Date, Discharge and Injunctions filed by Robert Devine on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Devine, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
18 18 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 09/14 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Arthur Murphy on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Murphy, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
court Order Authorizing Case Reassignment from KCF to MBK Mon 08/07 2:48 PM
Text Order Authorizing Case Reassignment effective August 7, 2023: Judge Kathryn C. Ferguson removed from the case. Judge Michael B. Kaplan added to the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan on 8/7/2023.. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
17 17 misc Document Tue 10/18 3:47 PM
Document re: Status Letter to Judge Ferguson filed by Robert Devine on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Devine, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
16 16 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 12/16 3:53 PM
Substitution of Attorney, terminating Geoffrey F. Sasso and Filed by Robert Devine on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Devine, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
15 15 misc Document Fri 11/19 5:32 PM
Document re: Notice of Entry of Order Approving Sixth Stipulation filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, July 30, 2021
14 14 misc Document Fri 07/30 11:45 AM
Document re: Notice of Entry of Order Approving Fifth Stipulation filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Monday, March 22, 2021
13 13 misc Document Mon 03/22 7:13 PM
Document re: Notice of Entry of Order Approving Fourth Stipulation filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
12 12 misc Document Tue 11/24 4:00 PM
Document re: Notice of Entry of Order Approving Third Stipulation filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 11, 2020
11 11 misc Document Thu 06/11 6:38 PM
Document re: Notice of Entry of Second Stipulation filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 18, 2020
10 10 misc Document Mon 05/18 10:31 PM
Document re: Notice of Stipulation and Agreed Order filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 04/02 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Document Wed 04/01 9:34 AM
Document re: Notice of Consent Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362 Granting the BSAs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 27, 2020
7 7 order Amended Motion Mon 03/30 12:04 PM
Order Granting Amended Motion re: Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to August 17, 2020 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/27/2020. (ghm)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
court Hearing Held Tue 03/24 4:20 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: GRANTED Related [+] (ckk)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Motion for Extention of time filed by Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
6 6 misc Document Tue 03/03 5:51 PM
Document re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Adversary Proceeding and Filing of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by the BSA, (ii) Meeting to Consider the Formation of an Official Committee of Creditors, and (iii) Filing of a motion by the BSA Debtors to Fix Venue for Claims Related to the Bankruptcy Under 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) and 1334(b). filed by Geoffrey F. Sasso on behalf of Boy Scouts of America. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 motion Amended Motion Tue 03/03 8:39 AM
Amended Motion. Reason for Amendment: Compliance w/ Local Rules Related [+] Filed by Patriots Path Council, Inc. Boy Scouts of America.Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Extend Time re: Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Boy Scouts of America
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 28, 2020
4 4 misc Document Fri 02/28 4:12 PM
Document re: STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9027(e)(3) filed by Rubin M. Sinins on behalf of Clark Fredericks. (Sinins, Rubin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
court Notice of Docketing Error Thu 02/27 4:21 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: PLEASE RE-FILE THE MOTION IN FULL COMPLIANCE WITH DNJ LBR 9013-1 THROUGH 9013-5. MOTION WILL NOT BE PROCESSED. NO HEARING WILL BE HELD, filed by HEIDI SORVINO. (ckk)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Boy Scouts of America
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
3 3 motion Extend Time Tue 02/25 6:34 PM
Motion to Extend Time re: Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Filed by Boy Scouts of America.Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Sorvino, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2 2 utility Case Assigned Wed 02/19 2:39 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Kathryn C. Ferguson added to the case. (mrg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/18 4:41 PM
Notice of Removal by State Court Defendant Boy Scouts of America by Geoffrey F. Sasso, Heidi J. Sorvino on behalf of Boy Scouts of America. Fee Amount $ 350.. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Sorvino, Heidi)
Related: [-]