Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-03632
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2020
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00451
Last checked: Monday Aug 17, 2020 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
JODY HEBERT
Represented By
William R Sieben
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info
Alicia N Sieben
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 02, 2022
13 13 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/05 2:09 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 07, 2020
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 03/07 11:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Master Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JODY HEBERT. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/19 2:00 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended Complaints (Short Form Complaints) due by 3/10/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 02/19 1:57 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENTS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 02/19 10:09 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00451. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 8:52 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-57) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-451 (JRT/KMM). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7458587) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/19/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet