Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:20-bk-00599
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2020
Terminated:Aug 07, 2023

TypeOther Entity Type
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Roman Catholic Diocese of Harrisburg
4800 Union Deposit Road
Harrisburg, PA 17111
Represented By
Evan Atkinson
Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis LLP
contact info
Paul G Gagne
Three Logan Square
contact info
Matthew Hermann Haverstick
Kleinbard LLC
contact info
Andrew Hunter Thornton
Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis LLP
contact info
Tyler Nathaniel Layne
Waller Lansden
contact info
Joshua J. Voss
Kleinbard LLC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 25, 2021 7:25 AM EDT
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Represented By
D. Troy Sellars
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Attorney
Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP
Represented By
Blake D Roth
Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP
contact info
Attorney
Stinson LLP
Represented By
Robert T Kugler
Stinson LLP
contact info
Attorney
Kleinbard, LLC
Represented By
Steven Jay Engelmyer
Kleinbard LLC
contact info
Joshua J. Voss
Kleinbard LLC
contact info
Claims Agent
Sid Garabato
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC 777 Third Avenue Ste 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
Unidentified Creditor
Represented By
Benjamin D Andreozzi
Andreozzi & Foote
contact info
Creditor
Gary Reising
Represented By
Jordan Merson
Merson Law PLLC
contact info
Creditor
PRA Receivables Management, LLC
PO Box 41021
Norfolk, VA 23541
Creditor
PNC Bank, National Association
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC Union Trust Building 501 Grant Street, Suite 200
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Kelly M Neal
Buchanan Ingersoll And Rooney PC
contact info
James D Newell
Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney PC
contact info
Timothy P. Palmer
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Mary Reitz
20 Sycamore Lane Apt. 151
Elizabethtown, PA 17022
Represented By
Paul C Bametzreider
Reilly Wolfson
contact info
Creditor
Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Newark
5 Becker Farm Road
Roseland, NJ 07068
Represented By
G. Glennon Troublefield
Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello
contact info
Creditor
Catholic Mutual Relief Society of America
Represented By
Gary D Bressler
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
J Mark Fisher
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Daniel J Schufreider
contact info
Jin Yan
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Everett J Cygal
contact info
Barry David Kleban
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter,
contact info
David M Spector
contact info
Creditor
Truist Company (f/k/a Branch Banking and Trust Company)
Represented By
Derek J Baker
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
COMMONWEALTH OF PA - UCTS
DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND INDUSTRY COLLECTIONS SUPPORT UNIT 651 BOAS ST, ROOM 925
HARRISBURG, PA 17121
Creditor
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services LLC fka GE Capital Information Technology Solutions
Bankruptcy Administration c/o A RicohUSA Program f/d/b/a IKON Financial Services PO Box 13708
Macon, GA 31208
Financial Advisor
Keegan Linscott & Associates, PC
Interested Party
Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By
Edwin H Caldie
Stinson LLP
contact info
Barry A. Solodky
Saxton & Stump, LLC
contact info
Robert T Kugler
Stinson LLP
contact info
Interested Party
RiverStone Insurance (UK) Limited
Represented By
Mohammad Tehrani
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Brett L Messinger
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Interested Party
S&T Bank successor to Integrity Bank
Represented By
Clayton W Davidson
Mcnees Wallace And Nurick LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Company of Europe Limited
Represented By
Mohammad Tehrani
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Brett L Messinger
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
33 West Monroe Street
Chicago, IL 60603
Represented By
Charles E Jones
Moss & Barnett
contact info
William Michael Buchanan
Burns White LLC
contact info
Ralph M Monico
Burns White LLC
contact info
Ralph Michael Monico
Burns White LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By
Peter J Garthwaite
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Mohammad Tehrani
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Russell Webb Roten
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Catalina J Sugayan
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Jeff D Kahane
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Brett L Messinger
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Russell W Roten
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Travelers Indemnity Company and certain of its affiliates
Represented By
Patrick Maxcy
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
M Keith Moskowitz
contact info
William E. Kelleher, Jr
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby
contact info
Kristen C Rodriguez
contact info
Geoffrey M Miller
contact info
Patrick C Maxcy
contact info
Interested Party
Catalina Worthing Insurance Ltd f/k/a HFPI
Represented By
Mohammad Tehrani
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Brett L Messinger
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Parishes, Schools and Related Entities
Brubaker Connaughton Goss & Lucarelli 480 New Holland Avenue, Suite 6205
Lancaster, PA 17602
Represented By
Ryan MacDonald
Brubaker Connaughton Goss & Lucarelli LLC
contact info
Robert W Pontz
Brubaker, Connaughton, Goss & Lucarelli
contact info
Rory O. Connaughton
Brubaker Connaughton Goss&lucarelli LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Zurich American Insurance Company, as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By
Frank Perch, III
White And Williams LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Attorney
Steven D Stambaugh Law, P.C.
Terminated: 08/31/2020
Stambaugh Law, P.C. 2121 South Queen Street
York, PA 17403
Represented By
Steven D Stambaugh
Stambaugh Law, P.C.
contact info

GPO Feb 17 2022
Opinion of the Court (RE: related document(s)841, 913, 1059). (Gambini, Christopher)
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 20, 2023
1635 1635 misc Chapter 11 - Post-Confirmation Report - PCR Mon 11/20 11:42 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 08/07/2023 Filed by Blake D Roth of Holland & Knight LLP on behalf of Roman Catholic Diocese of Harrisburg. (Roth, Blake)
Related: [-]