Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:20-cv-00141
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2020
Re-opened:May 09, 2025
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2020 6:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Dennis P. Duffy
Baker & Hostetler Llp (houston)
contact info
David J. Cocke
Evans Petree, Pc (memphis Office)
contact info
Joseph R. Buller, III
Baker & Hostetler Llp (houston)
contact info
Ashlee Cassman Grant
Baker & Hostetler Llp (houston)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynwood Pickens
Represented By
Michael A. Josephson
Josephson Dunlap, LLP
contact info
Charles P. Yezbak, III
Yezbak Law Offices
contact info
Richard J. Burch
Bruckner Burch PLLC
contact info
Andrew W. Dunlap
Josephson Dunlap, LLP
contact info
Richard M. Schreiber
Josephson Dunlap, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/27/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
135 135 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/13 2:38 PM
ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on July 14, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call 1-855-244-8681 and enter access code 23109640001# to be connected. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/13/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
134 134 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 05/12 10:50 AM
USCA MANDATE: as to120 Notice of Appeal filed by Lynwood Pickens,125 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC. MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. 24-5407 24-5459 (PJE) (kc)
Related: [-]