Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Mona K Majzoub
Case #: 2:14-cv-11482
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2014
Terminated:May 03, 2016
Last checked: Friday Dec 12, 2014 9:27 PM EST
Counter Claimant
Pere Marquette Shipping Company
Represented By
Richard A. Dietz
Foster, Meadows,
contact info
Counter Defendant
Melissa Douglas
Represented By
Dennis M. O'Bryan
O'Bryan, Baun, Karamanian
contact info
Defendant
Pere Marquette Shipping Company
Represented By
Richard A. Dietz
Foster, Meadows,
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Douglas
Represented By
Dennis M. O'Bryan
O'Bryan, Baun, Karamanian
contact info

GPO Sep 02 2015
OPINION and ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (KJac)
GPO Apr 07 2016
ORDER re 25 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Melissa Douglas, and SETTING MOTION HEARING re 26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds filed by Melissa Douglas. (Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2016 02:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
36 36 order Dismissing Case Tue 05/03 3:21 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
35 35 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/03 3:13 PM
ORDER Approving Distribution of Settlement Proceeds re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds filed by Melissa Douglas. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 05/03 3:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2016 re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds filed by Melissa Douglas. Disposition: Motion granted (Court Reporter: Marie Metcalf) (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
34 34 misc Sealed Exhibit Thu 04/28 4:05 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT G - Amended re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs respm Supplemental Brief Thu 04/28 4:04 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds filed by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit H - Guardian Ad Litem Report
Thursday, April 14, 2016
32 32 order Order Thu 04/14 3:52 PM
ORDER Establishing Trial Docket for the months of May/June 2016. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
31 31 misc Sealed Exhibit Tue 04/12 2:04 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT G re30 Supplemental Brief by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs respm Supplemental Brief Tue 04/12 2:02 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds with Sealed Exhibit filed by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
29 29 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Thu 04/07 11:35 AM
ORDER re25 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Melissa Douglas, and SETTING MOTION HEARING re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds filed by Melissa Douglas. ( Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2016 02:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox ) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
28 28 3 pgs trial Exhibit Tue 03/29 1:02 PM
EXHIBIT F - Amended re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds by Melissa Douglas (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2016
27 27 misc Sealed Exhibit Mon 03/28 4:05 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT re26 MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Motion - Free Mon 03/28 4:01 PM
MOTION for Order Approving Settlement and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit a - Certified Copy of Death Certificate,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit B - Death Scene Investigation Report,
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit C - Deposition of Marc Keen, M.D.,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Notice Letter to Interested Parties,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Waiver/Consent of Diane Douglas,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Waiver/Consent of Allison Woods
25 25 motion Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Mon 03/28 12:09 PM
MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Melissa Douglas. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Coval Consent Letter Dtd 3-24-16
Monday, November 02, 2015
24 24 trial Witness List Mon 11/02 3:54 PM
Supplemental Lay and Expert WITNESS LIST by Pere Marquette Shipping Company (Dietz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
23 23 trial Witness List Fri 10/30 2:45 PM
Final WITNESS LIST by Melissa Douglas (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Expert Report of Michael Thompson,
Att: 2 Verified Expert Report of Harold Josephs, P.E., Ph.D.
Thursday, October 29, 2015
22 22 trial Witness List Thu 10/29 12:26 PM
AMENDED LAY AND EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Pere Marquette Shipping Company (Dietz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2015
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/04 10:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/3/2015 Motion Cut-off set for 1/4/2016 Trailing Trial Docket set for May/June 2016 Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. Related [+] (KJac)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Thursday, September 03, 2015
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/03 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2015 (KJac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
20 20 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Wed 09/02 1:50 PM
OPINION and ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (KJac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
19 19 respm Supplemental Brief Tue 09/01 11:06 AM
[STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/1/15] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melissa Douglas. (O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 9/1/2015 (KJac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dennis M. O'Bryan,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A - O'Bryan Dec,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B - O'Bryan Dec,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C - O'Bryan Dec,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex D - O'Bryan Dec,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex E - O'Bryan Dec
order Text-Only Order Tue 09/01 4:02 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING re19 Supplemental Brief, filed by Melissa Douglas. Entered by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (KJac)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 09/01 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE CANCELING Hearing on 9/3/15 re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment only. The Court will rule on the briefs. THE PARTIES MUST APPEAR FOR THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (KJac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/25 1:44 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 9/3/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
18 18 notice Appear* Fri 08/21 4:16 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2015 10:30 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
17 17 trial Witness List Wed 07/22 3:01 PM
Lay and Expert WITNESS LIST by Pere Marquette Shipping Company (Dietz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Attachment 1 - R26(a)(2) Expert Report, CV, Case Testimony List, Fees of Robert K. Taylor, PE,
Att: 2 Document Continuation Attachment 2 - R26(a)(2) Expert Report, CV, Case Testimony List, Fees of L. J. Dragovic, M.D.
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
16 16 notice Notice - Other Tue 07/21 3:06 PM
NOTICE by Melissa Douglas of Unavailability of Counsel (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
15 15 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 06/02 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING on10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
14 14 trial Witness List Mon 06/01 1:47 PM
Supplemental WITNESS LIST by Melissa Douglas, Melissa Douglas (O'Bryan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2015
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/29 11:41 AM
REPLY to Response re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melissa Douglas, Melissa Douglas. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration of Dennis M. O'Bryan,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration
Friday, May 22, 2015
12 12 notice Hearing on Motion* Fri 05/22 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING on10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2015
11 11 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/20 3:52 PM
RESPONSE to10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pere Marquette Shipping Company. (Liddane, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Defendant's Response to Requsets to Admit,
Att: 3 10 pgs Exhibit B - November 3, 2011 U. S. Coast Guard Inspection Report,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit C - Excerpt Deposition of Captain Brian Jankowski,
Att: 5 5 pgs Exhibit D - Excerpt Deposition of Chief Engineer R. Prestridge,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Photograph of ATB UNDAUNTED/PERE MARQUETTE 41,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - USCG Form 2692 and USCG Subpoena to Pere Marquette,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit G - March 4, 1983 Memorandum of Understanding,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Controlling Authorities
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
10 10 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/29 2:47 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Melissa Douglas, Melissa Douglas. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration of Dennis M. O'Bryan,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to O'Bryan Declaration
Tuesday, August 26, 2014
9 9 ORDER Approving Security. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
8 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/26/2015 Motion Cut-off set for 9/28/2015 Trailing Trial Docket set for January/February 2016 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. Related [+] (JMcC)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2014 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 01, 2014
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/26/2014 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 31, 2014
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/25/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 30, 2014
7 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/11/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. Adjourned at request of Plaintiff's Counsel. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 20, 2014
6 6 1 pgs STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Pere Marquette Shipping Company (Dietz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 13, 2014
5 5 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Melissa Douglas, Melissa Douglas. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
4 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Pere Marquette Shipping Company against Pere Marquette Shipping Company by Pere Marquette Shipping Company. (Dietz, Richard) Modified on 6/13/2014 (EBro).[COUNTERCLAIM FILED AGAINST Melissa Douglas BY Pere Marquette Shipping Company and NO JURY DEMAND]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A - Affidavit of Chuck Leonard/Appraisal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter of Undertaking,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Order Approving Security
Wednesday, May 07, 2014
3 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Pere Marquette Shipping Company waiver sent on 4/18/2014, answer due 6/17/2014. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2014
2 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Pere Marquette Shipping Company* (DTyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melissa, as Personal Representative of the Estate Douglas, against Pere Marquette Shipping Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4592245 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oceana - County Where Action Arose: Mason - County of 1st Defendant: Mason. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): USDC Northern District of Illinois, 1:14-cv-02039, Judge Darrah ] (O'Bryan, Dennis)
Related: [-]