Save Our County et al v. United States Defense Logistics Agency et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Saundra Brown Armstrong |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-01267 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 18, 2020 1:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mark T. Esper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heritage Environmental Service, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Defense Logistics Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Darrell K. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Community In-Power and Development Association Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Save Our County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United Congregations of Metro East
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC
Terminated: 06/23/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/06 4:45 PM
ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/6/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 03/05 12:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/05 10:58 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East.. (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/04 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Ferrell for Federal Defendants (Ferrell, Taylor) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/24 5:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, Heritage Environmental Service, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
15 | 15
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 02/24 4:50 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/20 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Bernadette Jayanty (Jayanty, Sophia) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/20 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Novak (Novak, Suzanne) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/20 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/20 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Loarie (Loarie, Gregory) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 12:22 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sophia B. Jayanty. (mklS, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 12:10 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Suzanne Novak. (mklS, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 12:08 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz. (mklS, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 02/20 8:40 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 7:16 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14197534.) filed by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East. (Jayanty, Sophia) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 7:09 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14197524.) filed by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East. (Novak, Suzanne) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 7:02 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14197516.) filed by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East. (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 02/20 6:47 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East (Loarie, Gregory) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 02/20 6:33 AM
Proposed Summons. (Loarie, Gregory) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/20 6:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Mark T. Esper, Heritage Environmental Service, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14197430.). Filed byUnited Congregations of Metro East, Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club.(Loarie, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 48 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |