Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00014
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2020 3:01 AM EST
Defendant
Mark Avery Pickel (1)
Represented By
Joe Austin
Federal Defender Services Of Eastern Tennessee, Inc. (chatt)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
James T Brooks
U S Department Of Justice (chattanooga Usao)
contact info

GPO Jul 31 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Mark Avery Pickel: The Defendants sentencing hearing is scheduled before the Honorable District Judge Travis R. McDonough on December 4, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/31/2020. (BJL)
GPO Aug 14 2020
ORDER accepting and adopting 46 Report and Recommendations on Plea of Guilty as to Mark Avery Pickel (1). Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/14/2020. (AML)

Docket last updated: 02/22/2020 4:23 AM EST
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Mark Avery Pickel (1).(KFB) [1:20-mj-00018-CHS]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Mark Avery Pickel. Joe Austin for Mark Avery Pickel appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 2/12/20. (KFB) [1:20-mj-00018-CHS]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mark Avery Pickel. (KFB) [1:20-mj-00018-CHS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger:Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Mark Avery Pickel held on 2/12/2020, ( Arraignment set for 2/28/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger.) (Tape #Digital Recording 1B)Defendant Remanded to Custody. (KFB) [1:20-mj-00018-CHS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
5 5 ORDER ON CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Mark Avery Pickel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 2/13/20. Serviced to USM. (KFB) [1:20-mj-00018-CHS]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed in case as to Mark Avery Pickel. (SAC) [1:20-mj-00018-CHS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Mark Avery Pickel (1) counts 1, 2.(BJL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/20/2020) (CNC).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet -Pickel
8 8 Sealed Document-Unredacted Indictment (BJL)
Related: [-]