Member Case
Lead case is: 4:14-bk-42855

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 4:14-bk-42856
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2014
Terminated:Oct 31, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Nu-Way Service Station, Inc.
7450 Hall St
Saint Louis, MO 63147-2616
Represented By
Danielle A. Suberi
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC
contact info
Spencer P. Desai
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
111 South Tenth Street Suite 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102

GPO Jul 01 2015
Memorandum Opinion RE: Motion to Reject Collective Bargaining Agreements and to Terminate Retiree Benefits filed by Debtor N.W. Holding Co. and Motion to Reject Collective Bargaining Agreements and to Terminate Retiree Benefits filed by Debtor N.W. Holding Co. (jer, j)

Docket last updated: 11/10/2016 12:30 PM CST
Friday, April 11, 2014
1 1 8 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1213 Filed by Nu-Way Service Station, Inc. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/8/2014. Summary of schedules due 4/25/2014. Schedule A due 4/25/2014. Schedule B due 4/25/2014. Schedule C due 4/25/2014. Schedule D due 4/25/2014. Schedule E due 4/25/2014. Schedule F due 4/25/2014. Schedule G due 4/25/2014. Schedule H due 4/25/2014. Schedule I due 4/25/2014. Schedule J due 4/25/2014. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 4/25/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/25/2014. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 4/25/2014. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due 4/25/2014. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities due 4/25/2014. Credit Counseling Date: 4/25/2014. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/11/2014. Disclosure Statement due by 08/11/2014. (Desai, Spencer)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-42856 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00). Receipt number 10189703, amount $1213.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Danielle A. Suberi Filed by Debtor Nu-Way Service Station, Inc.. (Suberi, Danielle)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order and Notice of Missing Documents Summary of schedules due 4/25/2014. Schedule A due 4/25/2014. Schedule B due 4/25/2014. Schedule D due 4/25/2014. Schedule E due 4/25/2014. Schedule F due 4/25/2014. Schedule G due 4/25/2014. Schedule H due 4/25/2014. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 4/25/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/25/2014. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 4/25/2014. (jer, j)
Related: [-]