Member Case
Lead case is: 4:14-bk-40987

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:August B Landis
Case #: 2:14-bk-12524
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2014
Creditor Meeting:May 22, 2014
Claims Deadline:Aug 20, 2014
Terminated:May 15, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TELEXFREE, LLC
4705 S Durango Dr # 100-J51
Las Vegas, NV 89147-8155
Represented By
JOSEPH P. DAVIS
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
GREGORY E GARMAN
contact info
TERESA M. PILATOWICZ
Gordon Silver
contact info
THOMAS H. FELL
contact info
MARIA J. DICONZA
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
MARK M. WEISENMILLER
Gordon Silver Ltd.
contact info
MATTHEW HINKER
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
NANCY A. MITCHELL
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Debtor
TELEXFREE FINANCIAL, INC
2321 NW 37TH AVE.
COCONUT CREEK, FL 33063
Represented By
TERESA M. PILATOWICZ
Gordon Silver
contact info
THOMAS H. FELL
contact info
MARK M. WEISENMILLER
Gordon Silver Ltd.
contact info
Debtor
TELEXFREE, INC.
225 CEDAR HILL STREET SUITE 118
MARLBOROUGH, MA 01752
Represented By
TERESA M. PILATOWICZ
Gordon Silver
contact info
THOMAS H. FELL
contact info
MARK M. WEISENMILLER
Gordon Silver Ltd.
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
KURTZMAN CARSON CONSULTANTS LLC
2335 ALASKA AVENUE
EL SEGUNDO, CA 90245
Petitioning Creditor
ISMAIL KARATEKIN
8105 IRVINE CENTER DR, STE 600
IRVINE, CA 92618
Represented By
TIMOTHY S. CORY
Durham Jones & Pinegar
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
LEONARDO BARROS PEREIRA
8105 IRVINE CENTER DR, STE 600
IRVINE, CA 92618
Represented By
TIMOTHY S. CORY
Durham Jones & Pinegar
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
EDWARD M. MCDONALD
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. TelexFree Reaching Out to Investors, Creditors (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 05/28/2014
2. TelexFree bankruptcy sent back to Worcester court (telegram.com)
Submitted Wed 05/07/2014
Docket last updated: 05/06/2014 5:00 PM PDT
Sunday, April 13, 2014
1 1 19 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1213. Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC (FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 Meeting of Creditors 341 Meeting to be held on 05/15/2014 at 01:01 PM at 341s - Foley Bldg,Rm 1500. Last day to file Proof of Claims 08/13/2014.
Related: [-]
3 3 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-12524 [misc,volp11pb] (1213.00). Receipt number 15048664, fee amount $1213.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
4 4 Motion for Joint Administration 14-12525 14-12526 with Lead Case 14-12524 abl with Proposed Order Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC(FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Emergency Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Honor Credit Card Transactions, Chargebacks, Discounts and Commissions in the Ordinary Course of Business) with Proposed Order Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC(FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
6 6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Emergency Motion of the Debtors For Entry an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Income, Franchise and Similar Taxes and Regulatory Fees in the Ordinary Course of Business, and (II) Authorizing Banks and Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related Thereto) with Proposed Order Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC(FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 & 2
7 7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Emergency Motion of the Debtors For Entry of Interim and Final Orders Pursuant to Section 105(a) and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service, (II) Deeming Utilities Adequately Assured of Future Performance, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment) with Proposed Order Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC(FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- 3
8 8 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts Nunc Pro Tunc as of the Petition Date) with Proposed Order Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC(FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
9 9 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Wages) with Proposed Order Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of TELEXFREE, LLC(FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2